Lovins v. GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Valerie Lovins and Valerie L. Lovins
Defendant: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Not Classified By Court: Neal L. O'Toole
Case Number: 8:2022cv00936
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #16--mediation order; permitting the parties to appear by video with the mediator's approval. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/14/2022. (KRM)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER appointing Neal L. O'Toole as mediator; designating Taylor R. Bowman as lead counsel; directing the parties to mediate not later than 8/3/2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/14/2022. (KRM)
June 13, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on August 3, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. before Neal O'Toole. (Sacks, John)
June 13, 2022 Filing 14 ***TERMINATED-DISCOVERY***NOTICE by Valerie L. Lovins Plaintiff's Rule (26)(A)(1) Disclosures (Sacks, John) Modified on 6/13/2022 (CTR). (CTR).
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final pretrial conference scheduled for 9/28/2023 at 10:00AM in Tampa Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone; jury trial set for the October 2023 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/2/2022. (KRM)
May 16, 2022 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Bowman, Taylor)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER striking #10--reply to affirmative defenses. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/9/2022. (KRM)
May 5, 2022 Filing 10 ***STRICKEN PER ORDER #11*** REPLY to affirmative defenses by Valerie L. Lovins. (Sacks, John) Modified on 5/9/2022 (KRM).
April 25, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c) and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY)
April 25, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Bowman, Taylor)
April 25, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. (Bowman, Taylor)
April 25, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Taylor Richard Bowman on behalf of GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Taylor R. Bowman. (Bowman, Taylor)
April 22, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Matthew Alan Kassel of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
April 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
April 22, 2022 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:22-cv-0936-SDM-AAS. (SJB)
April 22, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy)(Bowman, Taylor)
April 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Thirteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Hillsborough County, Florida, case number 2022-CA-002743 filed in State Court on 4/1/2021. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19487090 filed by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Removal)(Bowman, Taylor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovins v. GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Lovins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie L. Lovins
Represented By: John Patrick Sacks
Represented By: Matthew Alan Kassel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Taylor Richard Bowman
Represented By: Steven D. Lehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Neal L. O'Toole
Represented By: Neal L. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?