Hooker v. Sly et al
Plaintiff: Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr.
Defendant: Rosa Sly, Michele Wooten, Ryan Redlawsk and Karen Mulcahy
Case Number: 8:2022cv00957
Filed: April 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
2 Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER denying Hooker's #8 Motion to Consolidate Cases because keeping these actions separate does not "present the probability of inefficiency or inconsistency." Local Rule 1.07(b). Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 5/31/2022. (JMB)
May 18, 2022 Filing 11 PROOF of Service on 5/2/22 via Priority Mail as to U.S. Attorney General by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (BD)
May 18, 2022 Filing 10 PROOF of Service on 5/2/22 via Priority Mail as to Department of Veterans Affairs by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (BD)
May 18, 2022 Filing 9 PROOF of Service on 4/30/22 via Priority Mail as to Department of Affairs by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (BD)
May 7, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (BD)
May 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. Related case(s): Yes (BD)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL CASE ORDER. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within forty days after any defendant appears for the purposes of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 5/3/2022. (JMB)
May 2, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. Related case(s): Yes (BD)
April 29, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Karen Mulcahy, Ryan Redlawsk, Rosa Sly, Michele Wooten. (SEG)
April 29, 2022 FEES Paid by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (Filing fee $402.00, Receipt Number TPA066368). (ARC) Modified text on 5/2/2022 (JNB).
April 27, 2022 Filing 3 Case Reassigned to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle. New case number: 8:22-cv-957-KKM-AAS. Judge Thomas P. Barber no longer assigned to the case. (JNB)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 1.07(a), this case is transferred to the Honorable Kathryn Kimball Mizelle, with her consent, for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 4/27/2022. (ANL)
April 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Karen Mulcahy, Ryan Redlawsk, Rosa Sly, Michele Wooten with Jury Demand filed by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(No filing fee paid; No IFP)(BD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooker v. Sly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Sly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Redlawsk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Mulcahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?