Skyline Partners Technology, LLC v. Jabil, Inc.
Plaintiff: Skyline Partners Technology, LLC
Defendant: Jabil, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2022cv01128
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 Motion to Stay these proceedings and compel arbitration. The Clerk is directed to administratively close this case during the pendency of the stay. The parties shall file a notice upon completion of arbitration. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/8/2022. (CCB)
July 8, 2022 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration by Jabil, Inc. (Leone, Dennis)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #1 Complaint. Response due by 7/8/2022. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/8/2022. (CCB)
June 8, 2022 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jabil, Inc. (Leone, Dennis)
June 8, 2022 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Jabil Inc. (Leone, Dennis)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiff's #16 Amended Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Robert J. Mendes and #17 Amended Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Micah N. Bradley. If counsel have not already done so, within fourteen (14) days hereof, they shall complete the e-filer registration (more information available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 5/25/2022. (ACL)
May 23, 2022 Filing 17 AMENDED MOTION to Amend Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Micah N. Bradley and Designation and Consent to Act by Skyline Partners Technology, LLC. (Curtin, Kenneth)
May 23, 2022 Filing 16 AMENDED MOTION to Amend Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Robert J. Mendes and Designation and Consent to Act by Skyline Partners Technology, LLC. (Curtin, Kenneth)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Robert J. Mendes and #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Micah N. Bradley. It appears the motions fail to comply with Local Rule 2.01(b)(1)(E), as incorporated by Local Rule 2.01(c)(5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 5/20/2022. (ACL)
May 19, 2022 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 5/18/22 by Skyline Partners Technology, LLC as to Jabil, Inc. (LNR)
May 19, 2022 Filing 13 PROOF of service by Skyline Partners Technology, LLC. (Curtin, Kenneth)
May 17, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Micah N. Bradley to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19580244 for $150 by Skyline Partners Technology, LLC. (Curtin, Kenneth) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
May 17, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Robert J. Mendes to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19580222 for $150 by Skyline Partners Technology, LLC. (Curtin, Kenneth) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
May 17, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kenneth M. Curtin on behalf of Skyline Partners Technology, LLC. Lead Counsel: Kenneth M. Curtin, Esquire. (Curtin, Kenneth)
May 17, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Skyline Partners Technology, LLC. Related case(s): No (Curtin, Kenneth)
May 17, 2022 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Skyline Partners Technology, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Skyline Partners Technology, LLC for Skyline Partners Technology, LLC. (Curtin, Kenneth)
May 17, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH)
May 17, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH)
May 17, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsels Robert J. Mendes and Micah N. Bradley of Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
May 17, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
May 17, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Skyline Partners Technology, LLC. (BD)
May 16, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:22-cv-1128-WFJ-CPT. (SJB)
May 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Skyline Partners Technology, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19572359) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Manufacturing Services Agreement, #2 Exhibit Addendum No. 1 to Manufacturing Agreement, #3 Exhibit 03.04.2022 Letter from Jabil to Skyline Partners Technology, LLC re Termination, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Curtin, Kenneth) Modified on 5/16/2022 to correct docket text (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skyline Partners Technology, LLC v. Jabil, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skyline Partners Technology, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth M. Curtin
Represented By: Micah N. Bradley
Represented By: Robert J. Mendes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jabil, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis D Leone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?