Securities and Exchange Commission v. Taronis Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Taronis Technologies, Inc., Taronis Fuels, Inc., Scott David Mahoney and Tyler Burnett Wilson
Case Number: 8:2022cv01939
Filed: August 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0077 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File 35-Page Motion to Dismiss < by Tyler Burnett Wilson. (Schwartz, Adam) Modified on 10/20/2022 to edit text. (LD).
October 18, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of hearing: Initial Case Management Conference set for NOVEMBER 16, 2022, at 09:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 A before Judge Thomas P. Barber. (SRC)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER: "Defendant Tyler Wilson's Unopposed Motion for 10-Day Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Complaint" (Doc. #23) is granted. Wilson may file his response to the complaint on or before November 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 10/18/2022. (EKB)
October 17, 2022 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Tyler Burnett Wilson. (Vitali, Andrew)
October 14, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Vitali, III on behalf of Tyler Burnett Wilson (Vitali, Andrew)
October 14, 2022 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 9 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule, Local Rule 3.03 Disclosure Statement by Tyler Burnett Wilson. (Schwartz, Adam)
October 14, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Defendant Tyler Wilson's Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Appearance by Adam Louis Schwartz on behalf of Tyler Burnett Wilson (Schwartz, Adam)
October 11, 2022 Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Nestor, Christine)
September 23, 2022 Filing 18 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Taronis Technologies, Inc. (LD)
September 22, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Taronis Technologies, Inc. by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Nestor, Christine) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
September 9, 2022 Filing 16 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Taronis Fuels, Inc.. (Hoffman, Brian)
September 2, 2022 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Brian Neil Hoffman (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA067174.) Related document: #13 MOTION for Brian Neil Hoffman to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
September 1, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Nestor, Christine)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Brian Neil Hoffman may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel submit their Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration within seven days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 8/31/2022. (BEE)
August 31, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Brian Neil Hoffman to appear pro hac vice. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
August 31, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Securities and Exchange Commission. Related case(s): No (Nestor, Christine)
August 30, 2022 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 08/29/2022 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Taronis Technologies, Inc.. (Nestor, Christine)
August 29, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
August 29, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
August 26, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alejandro O. Soto on behalf of Scott David Mahoney (Soto, Alejandro)
August 25, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER of service returned executed on 08/25/2022 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Tyler Burnett Wilson. (Nestor, Christine)
August 25, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Taronis Technologies, Inc., Tyler Burnett Wilson. (SET)
August 25, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Michelle Bosworth of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SET)
August 25, 2022 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Motion for Entry of Judgment Against Defendant Scott David Mahoney by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Consent, #2 Exhibit A-1 Judgment)(Nestor, Christine)
August 24, 2022 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment For Entry of Final Judgment Against Defendant Taronis Fuels, Inc. by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A. Consent, #2 Exhibit A-1. Judgment)(Nestor, Christine)
August 24, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:22-cv-1939-TPB-AAS. (SJB)
August 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Injunctive And Other Relief against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Nestor, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Taronis Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Christine Nestor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taronis Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taronis Fuels, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Neil Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott David Mahoney
Represented By: Alejandro O. Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Burnett Wilson
Represented By: Adam Louis Schwartz
Represented By: Andrew Vitali, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?