State of Florida et al v. Food and Drug Administration et al
Plaintiff: State of Florida and Florida Agency for Health Care Administration
Defendant: Food and Drug Administration, Department of Health and Human Services, Robert M Califf and Xavier Becerra
Case Number: 8:2022cv01981
Filed: August 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Edward Hart on behalf of State of Florida (Hart, Joseph)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by R. Trent McCotter on behalf of Florida Agency for Health Care Administration. Lead Counsel: R. Trent McCotter. (McCotter, R.)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jonathan Berry Esq (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA067311.) Related document: #15 Unopposed MOTION for Jonathan Berry to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney R. Trent McCotter (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA067310.) Related document: #14 Unopposed MOTION for R. Trent McCotter to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jared M. Kelson Esq (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA067312.) Related document: #16 Unopposed MOTION for Jared M. Kelson to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney C. Boyden Gray Esq (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA067309.) Related document: #17 Unopposed MOTION for C. Boyden Gray to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Ruthsatz Stephens on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Robert M Califf, Department of Health and Human Services, Food and Drug Administration (Stephens, Kimberly)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for C. Boyden Gray. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 9/30/2022. (SMC)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jared M. Kelson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 9/30/2022. (SMC)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan Berry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 9/30/2022. (SMC)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for R. Trent McCotter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 9/30/2022. (SMC)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendants' "Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint" (Doc. #13) is granted. Defendants may file their response to the complaint on or before November 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/30/2022. (ANL)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for C. Boyden Gray to appear pro hac vice by Florida Agency for Health Care Administration. (Sheeran, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Jared M. Kelson to appear pro hac vice by Florida Agency for Health Care Administration. (Sheeran, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Jonathan Berry to appear pro hac vice by Florida Agency for Health Care Administration. (Sheeran, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for R. Trent McCotter to appear pro hac vice by Florida Agency for Health Care Administration. (Sheeran, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. (Scott, Olivia)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James W Harlow on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Robert M Califf, Department of Health and Human Services, Food and Drug Administration (Harlow, James)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE by State of Florida of Lead Counsel Designation (Percival, James)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Andrew T. Sheeran on behalf of Florida Agency for Health Care Administration. Lead Counsel: Andrew T. Sheeran. (Sheeran, Andrew)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROOF of service by Florida Agency for Health Care Administration (Sheeran, Andrew)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Xavier Becerra, Robert M Califf, Department of Health and Human Services, Food and Drug Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (LSS)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Proposed Summons)(Sheeran, Andrew)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Florida Agency for Health Care Administration, State of Florida. (Sheeran, Andrew)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Department of Health and Human Services, Food and Drug Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (LSS)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:22-cv-1981-TPB-JSS. (SJB)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19936840) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Summons)(Sheeran, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Florida et al v. Food and Drug Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Florida
Represented By: Andrew T. Sheeran
Represented By: James Hamilton Percival, II
Represented By: Henry Charles Whitaker
Represented By: Joseph Edward Hart
Represented By: Natalie Christmas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Agency for Health Care Administration
Represented By: Andrew T. Sheeran
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Represented By: C. Boyden Gray
Represented By: Jared M. Kelson
Represented By: Jonathan Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food and Drug Administration
Represented By: Olivia R. Hussey Scott
Represented By: James W Harlow
Represented By: Kimberly Ruthsatz Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Olivia R. Hussey Scott
Represented By: James W Harlow
Represented By: Kimberly Ruthsatz Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M Califf
Represented By: Olivia R. Hussey Scott
Represented By: James W Harlow
Represented By: Kimberly Ruthsatz Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Olivia R. Hussey Scott
Represented By: James W Harlow
Represented By: Kimberly Ruthsatz Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?