Bartolo Medical Sales, Inc. et al v. 3B Medical, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bartolo Medical Sales, Levelox Inc, Bartolo Medical Sales, Inc. and Levelox, Inc.
Defendant: 3B Medical, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2022cv02307
Filed: October 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Susser, Steven)
November 9, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Ryan Matthew Clancy on behalf of 3B Medical, Inc. Lead Counsel: Steven Susser, Esq. (Clancy, Ryan) Modified on 11/9/2022 (CTR).
November 8, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by 3B Medical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent React Health Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Medicomp, Inc., Other Affiliate 3B Medical Manufacturing, LLC, Other Affiliate Ventec Life Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Watermark Medical, Inc., Other Affiliate Medi-Lynx Cardiac Monitoring, LLC for 3B Medical, Inc. (Clancy, Ryan) Modified on 11/9/2022 (CTR).
November 8, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by 3B Medical, Inc.(Clancy, Ryan) Modified on 11/9/2022 (CTR).
November 1, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE to counsel Ryan Matthew Clancy of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Steven Craig Susser and Timothy J. Murphy may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, Counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 11/1/2022. (EPW)
October 31, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Steven Craig Susser to appear pro hac vice by 3B Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Special Admission Attorney Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Clancy, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
October 31, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Timothy J. Murphy to appear pro hac vice by 3B Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Special Admission Attorney Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Clancy, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying without prejudice #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with Local Rule 2.01(c). See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 10/28/2022. (EPW)
October 26, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Timothy J. Murphy to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20133791 for $150 by 3B Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Special Admission Attorney Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Clancy, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
October 26, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Steven Craig Susser to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20133752 for $150 by 3B Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Special Admission Attorney Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Clancy, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
October 19, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Scott Randall Rost on behalf of Bartolo Medical Sales, Inc., Levelox, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Scott R. Rost. (Rost, Scott)
October 12, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c) and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2). -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. - (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY)
October 11, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Scott Randall Rost of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR)
October 11, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:22-cv-2307-SDM-AEP. (SJB)
October 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rost, Scott) Modified on 10/11/2022 (CTR).
October 11, 2022 FEE PAID. Filing fee for new civil case, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20076342 for $402 paid. (Rost, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartolo Medical Sales, Inc. et al v. 3B Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bartolo Medical Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levelox Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bartolo Medical Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Randall Rost
Represented By: Nhan T. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levelox, Inc.
Represented By: Nhan T. Lee
Represented By: Scott Randall Rost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3B Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J. Murphy
Represented By: Steven Susser
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?