Kukorinis v. Walmart, Inc.
Plaintiff: VASSILIOS KUKORINIS
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Gregory P. Holder
Case Number: 8:2022cv02402
Filed: October 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2023 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Amended Complaint due by 7/20/2023 (JK)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: Defendant Walmart, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint (Doc. #25) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Count III is DISMISSED without prejudice. Count IV is DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff Vassilios Kukorinis may file an amended complaint as to Count III within 14 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/6/2023. (DRG)
July 3, 2023 Filing 51 Joint STATUS report by Walmart, Inc.. (Torres, Christopher) (Modified on 7/3/2023 to edit docket text) (JDR).
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ENDORSED ORDER: On June 6, 2023, the parties filed a joint status report, explaining that they had retained a private mediator, with whom they had completed one session, and had scheduled a second session to occur on June 16, 2023. Accordingly, by July 5, 2023, the parties are directed to file a brief status report. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/30/2023. (DRG)
June 6, 2023 Filing 49 STATUS report -- Joint Status Report -- by Vassilios Kukorinis. (Donaldson-Smith, Kimberly) Modified on 6/6/2023 (CTR).
April 5, 2023 Filing 48 RESPONSE re #47 Notice of filing supplemental authority -- Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Walmart Inc.'s Notice of Supplemental Authority -- filed by Vassilios Kukorinis. (Donaldson-Smith, Kimberly)
April 5, 2023 Filing 47 NOTICE of supplemental authority by Walmart, Inc. (Jackson, Raymond) Modified on 4/5/2023 (CTR).
March 24, 2023 Filing 46 STIPULATED AGREEMENT RE: Protocol for the Discovery of Electronically Stored Information.(ABC)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 3/24/2023. (ABC)
March 23, 2023 Filing 44 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically For Entry of the Stipulated Agreement Re: Protocol for the Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by Vassilios Kukorinis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ESI Protocol)(Donaldson-Smith, Kimberly)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendant Walmart has filed a Motion for Leave to File Reply (Doc. #42) in support of its Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #25). In light of the Court's review of the underlying Motion to Dismiss, the Motion for Leave to File Reply is denied. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/22/2023. (DRG)
February 21, 2023 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Walmart, Inc. (Jackson, Raymond) Modified on 2/21/2023 (CTR).
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/15/2023. (ABC)
February 13, 2023 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for Robert J. Herrington to appear pro hac vice ; Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20506416 for $150 by Walmart, Inc. (Jackson, Raymond) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. Modified on 2/14/2023 (CTR).
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER appointing Gregory Holder as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for November 14, 2023, at 9:00 AM. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/7/2023. (DRG)
February 7, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on November 14, 2023 beginning at 9:00 a.m. before Hon. Gregory P. Holder (Retired Judge). (Donaldson-Smith, Kimberly)
February 3, 2023 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint filed by Vassilios Kukorinis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Walmart Return Policy Exceptions)(Donaldson-Smith, Kimberly)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/25/2023. (MEJ)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order Doc. #34, no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/25/2023. (MEJ)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2024 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for the May 2024 Trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Conduct mediation hearing by 12/7/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/25/2023. (MEJ)
January 13, 2023 Filing 33 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Jackson, Raymond)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ENDORSED ORDER granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response and for Leave to File Response of More than Twenty Pages. (Doc. #31). Plaintiff Vassilios Kukorinis may file a response to Walmart's Motion to Dismiss, not to exceed 25 pages, by February 3, 2023. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/13/2023. (DRG)
January 13, 2023 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint and MOTION to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs. (Donaldson-Smith, Kimberly) . Added MOTION to File Excess Pages on 1/13/2023 (MCB).
January 13, 2023 Filing 30 Joint NOTICE Regarding Conferral by Walmart, Inc. re #26 Notice (Other), #25 MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint (Jackson, Raymond) Modified text on 1/13/2023 (MCB).
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 1/11/2023. (ABC)
January 10, 2023 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Naomi Beer to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20381942 for $150 by Walmart, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jackson, Raymond) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. Modified on 1/10/2023 (CTR).
January 10, 2023 Filing 27 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc. (Jackson, Raymond) Modified on 1/10/2023 (CTR).
January 9, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE by Vassilios Kukorinis re #25 MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint -- Notice i=of Plaintiff's Counterstatement to Walmart's "Local Rule 3.01(g) Certification" Filed with it's Motion to Dismiss [DKT. NO. 25 -- (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Donaldson-Smith, Kimberly) Modified on 1/10/2023 (CTR).
January 6, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Jackson, Raymond)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court extends the answer deadline to January 6, 2023, and the case management report deadline is extended to January 13, 2023. These deadlines will not be extended again. Here defendant was served on October 21 and notices of appearance filed on November 9, 2022. The Court is now providing close to two months from when the notices were filed and more than two months from when the defendant was served to investigate the case and prepare its responsive pleading. The Court appreciates and encourages counsel to communicate and attempt to resolve their differences. However, the Court takes seriously its obligation to move cases forward to resolution and excessive and repetitive extensions of time do not serve that goal. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/9/2022. (Covington, Virginia)
December 9, 2022 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a response to the Complaint and Joint Motion by Plaintiff and Walmart Inc. for Extension of Deadline to submit Case Management Report by Walmart, Inc. (Jackson, Raymond) Modified on 12/12/2022 (CTR).
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report. (Doc. #21). The Case Management Report is now due January 9, 2023. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/18/2022. (DRG)
November 17, 2022 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report by Walmart, Inc.. (Jackson, Raymond)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 11/14/2022. (ABC)
November 11, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Zachary P. Beatty to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20189576 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Beatty, Zachary) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time. (Doc. #17). Defendant's answer is now due December 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/10/2022. (DRG)
November 9, 2022 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Walmart, Inc. (Torres, Christopher) Modified text on 11/14/2022 (MCB).
November 9, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond D. Jackson on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Jackson, Raymond)
November 9, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Torres on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Torres, Christopher)
October 25, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Vassilios Kukorinis. Related case(s): No (Donaldson-Smith, Kimberly)
October 25, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Vassilios Kukorinis. (Donaldson-Smith, Kimberly)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by November 25, 2022, file a completed Case Management Report. The Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery in the vast majority of cases. If the parties believe that more than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. After the Case Management Report is filed, the Court will determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/25/2022. (DRG)
October 24, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kimberly M Donaldson-Smith on behalf of Vassilios Kukorinis. Lead Counsel: Kimberly M. Donaldson-Smith. (Donaldson-Smith, Kimberly)
October 24, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on October 21, 2022 by Vassilios Kukorinis as to Walmart, Inc. (Beatty, Zachary) Modified on 10/24/2022 (CTR).
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/21/2022. (ABC)
October 20, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Kimberly M. Donaldson-Smith to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20114053 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Beatty, Zachary) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
October 20, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Nicholas E. Chimicles to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20113913 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Beatty, Zachary) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
October 20, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE to counsel Zachary P. Beatty, Kimberly Donaldson-Smith, and Nicholas E. Chimicles Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR)
October 20, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Zachary P. Beatty of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR)
October 20, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Walmart, Inc. (CTR)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/19/2022. (ABC)
October 19, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:22-cv-2402-VMC-TGW. (SJB)
October 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20109072) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Beatty, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kukorinis v. Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VASSILIOS KUKORINIS
Represented By: Zachary P. Beatty
Represented By: Nicholas E. Chimicles
Represented By: Kimberly M Donaldson-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Torres
Represented By: Raymond D. Jackson
Represented By: Naomi G. Beer
Represented By: Robert J. Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Gregory P. Holder
Represented By: Gregory P. Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?