Haak v. Generac Power Systems, Inc
Plaintiff: Daniel Haak
Defendant: Generac Power Systems, Inc
Case Number: 8:2022cv02470
Filed: October 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of compliance re 19 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Generac Power Systems, Inc (Olsen, Michael)
December 16, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of compliance re 19 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Generac Power Systems, Inc (Gill, Michael)
December 16, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of compliance re 19 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Generac Power Systems, Inc (Hansen, Elspeth)
December 13, 2022 Filing 20 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Generac Power Systems, Inc identifying Other Affiliate Generac Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate General Acquisition Corp. for Generac Power Systems, Inc. (Duke, Samantha) Modified text on 12/14/2022 (MCB).
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Motion for Michael A. Olsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #17 Motion for Michael J. Gill to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and granting #18 Motion for Elspeth V. Hansen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Michael A. Olsen, Michael J. Gill, and Elspeth V. Hansen may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 12/6/2022. (BMM)
December 5, 2022 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Elspeth V. Hansen to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20267447 for $150 by Generac Power Systems, Inc. (Duke, Samantha) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
December 5, 2022 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Michael J. Gill to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. BFLMDC-20267368 for $150 by Generac Power Systems, Inc. (Duke, Samantha) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
December 5, 2022 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Michael A. Olsen to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20267297 for $150 by Generac Power Systems, Inc. (Duke, Samantha) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
December 5, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of compliance re 13 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Daniel Haak (Flint, Jacob)
December 2, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of compliance re 13 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Daniel Haak (Rosemergy, James)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Attorney James Jonathan Rosemergy to Appear Pro Hac Vice and granting #12 Motion for Attorney Jacob Alex Flint to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Rosemergy and Flint may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 11/28/2022. (BMM)
November 22, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Jacob Alex Flint to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20229980 for $150 by Daniel Haak. (Baldwin, Matthew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
November 22, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for James Jonathan Rosemergy to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20229914 for $150 by Daniel Haak. (Baldwin, Matthew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
November 22, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 11/7/2022 by Daniel Haak as to Generac Power Systems, Inc. (Baldwin, Matthew) Modified text on 11/22/2022 (MCB).
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying part Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Doc. #6). The Court extends the deadline to file a response to the complaint to December 28, 2022. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/21/2022. (CKW)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by January 6, 2023, file a completed Case Management Report. The Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery in the vast majority of cases. If the parties believe that more than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. After the Case Management Report is filed, the Court will determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/21/2022. (CKW)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel for Defendant has appeared, but Plaintiff has not yet filed the return of service, or proof of waiver, as required under the Rule. Accordingly, Plaintiff is directed to file either the return of service or proof of waiver by November 23, 2022, so that the Court may accurately set case management deadlines. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/21/2022. (CKW)
November 21, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Generac Power Systems, Inc. (Duke, Samantha)
November 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles P. Mitchell on behalf of Generac Power Systems, Inc (Mitchell, Charles)
October 31, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Generac Power Systems, Inc. (MCB)
October 31, 2022 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Daniel Haak. (Baldwin, Matthew)
October 31, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:22-cv-02470-VMC-AEP. (APV)
October 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against Generac Power Systems, Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20144124) filed by Daniel Haak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Baldwin, Matthew) Modified text on 10/31/2022 (MCB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haak v. Generac Power Systems, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Haak
Represented By: Matthew Lee Baldwin
Represented By: Jacob A. Flint
Represented By: Jacbo Alex Flint
Represented By: James J. Rosemergy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Generac Power Systems, Inc
Represented By: Michael Jon Gill
Represented By: Charles P. Mitchell
Represented By: Elspeth V. Hansen
Represented By: Michael A. Olsen
Represented By: Samantha Crawford Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?