Hopkins v. Florida Department of Corrections, et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hopkins
Defendant: Florida Department of Corrections, Corizon LLC, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Tridentcare Imaging, Avilas, Michelle J Daniels, R. Jenkins, T. Barton, Elliot Perez, Ernesto L. Toledo, Angie Deason, Hernandez and Calderon
Case Number: 8:2023cv00128
Filed: January 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2023 Filing 38 TRANSFER to Jacksonville Division and assigned case number 3:23-cv-57-BJD-MCR (SET)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER transferring case to the Jacksonville Division and directing Clerk to accomplish same. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 1/20/2023. (CCB)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STANDING ORDER for all confined pro se litigants. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 1/19/2023. (AG)
January 19, 2023 Filing 35 TRANSFER IN from the Nothern District of Florida (Panama City Division). Case assigned to District Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New Case Number: 8:23-cv-128-WFJ-JSS. (AG)
January 19, 2023 Filing 34 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 5:22-cv-00124. File received electronically
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re #32 Third Amended Complaint. It is ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida and shall close this case in the Northern District of Florida. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 1/19/2023. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
January 18, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #32 Third Amended Complaint. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
January 17, 2023 Filing 32 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against AVILAS, CALDERON, filed by JOE HOPKINS. (No service copies filed.) (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REFERRAL AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion, Doc. #29, is DENIED because it is moot in light of this court's order of December 27, 2022. Doc. #27. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 1/11/2023. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #28 "Motion to Inform" and for an Enlargement of Time. On or before 1/31/2023, Plaintiff shall file a notice of voluntary dismissal or a third amended complaint in accordance with this court's order of December 14, 2022. Doc. #22. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 1/11/2023. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
January 10, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #28 MOTION for Extension of Time, #29 MOTION TO REQUEST A RULING re #23 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
January 9, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION TO REQUEST A RULING re #23 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JOE HOPKINS. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
January 9, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION TO INFORM THE HONOURABLE [sic] COURT OF PLAINTF'S [sic] CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND TO REQUEST AN ENLARGEMENT OF TIME as to #22 Order by JOE HOPKINS. (Address updated to HARDEE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, 6901 STATE ROAD 62, BOWLING GREEN, FL 33834) (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying without prejudice #23 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 12/27/2022. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
December 19, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Change of Address by JOE HOPKINS (Updated address already on file.) (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
December 19, 2022 Filing 25 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Re: #19 ***VACATED PER #21 ORDER***. (Updated address on file.) (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
December 14, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Address by JOE HOPKINS. (Address updated to RMC WEST UNIT, PO BOX 628, LAKE BUTLER, FL 32054) (#22 Order mailed to updated address.) (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
December 14, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JOE HOPKINS. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #16 Second Amended Complaint. The clerk of the court shall send to Plaintiff a civil-rights complaint form for use by prisoners in actions under 42 U.S.C. 1983. On or before 1/13/2023, Plaintiff shall: a. file a notice of voluntary dismissal under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i); or b. file an amended complaint that complies with this order, which shall be typed or clearly written with adequate spacing between lines and marked as Plaintiff's "Third Amended Complaint." Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 12/14/2022. (jcw)(Form sent as ordered.) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
December 14, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #23 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - Accordingly, it is ORDERED that this court's order of December 2, 2022, Doc. #19, is VACATED, and Plaintiff need not comply with the requirements set for in that order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 12/7/2022. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
December 6, 2022 Filing 20 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number FLN300015799. Fee status updated to paid. (jfj) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
December 6, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: 20 Filing Fee Received. (jfj) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ***VACATED PER #21 ORDER*** ORDER. On or before December 23, 2022, Plaintiff shall: file a notice of voluntary dismissal; or explain and show cause why Plaintiff failed to comply with this court's order of October 7, 2022 which ordered Plaintiff to pay the $402.00 fee or file a fully-completed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; sign in the presence of a notary a statement setting forth the steps including the dates Plaintiff took those steps that Plaintiff took to comply with this court's order of October 7, 2022; and include in his response to this show-cause order the signed, notarized statement. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 12/02/22. (Notice of Voluntary Dismissal or Show Cause Response due by 12/23/2022.) (jfj) Modified on 12/7/2022 (jcw). [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
December 2, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE by JOE HOPKINS re #14 REFERRAL AND ORDER. (jfj) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
December 2, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #18 NOTICE by JOE HOPKINS re #14 REFERRAL AND ORDER. (jfj) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
December 1, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address by JOE HOPKINS. Plaintiff is at the South Florida Reception Center. (Clerk previously updated address in CM-ECF. See docket entry #15.) (jfj) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
November 16, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #16 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JOE HOPKINS. (Attachments: # 1 Florida Department of Corrections Inmate Trust Fund Special Withdrawal) (jfj) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
November 14, 2022 Filing 16 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JOE HOPKINS. (Attachments: #1 Florida Department of Corrections Inmate Trust Fund Special Withdrawal) (jfj) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
November 14, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address by JOE HOPKINS. Plaintiff is now at South Florida Reception Centre, 1400 NW 41 ST, Doral, FL 33178. (Clerk has updated address in case docket on CM-ECF.) (jfj) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 11/28/2022, Plaintiff shall (1) file a notice of voluntary dismissal or a second amended complaint; and (2) if he files a second amended complaint, pay the $402.00 fee or file a fully-completed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in accordance with this courts order of October 7, 2022. Doc. #11. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 11/7/2022. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
November 4, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time as to #11 Order by JOE HOPKINS. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
November 4, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #13 MOTION for Extension of Time Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. This matter is before this court on Plaintiff's letter to the undersigned. It is ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall return Plaintiff's letter without filing it on the electronic docket. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 10/17/22. (jfj) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, Doc. #10, is DENIED without prejudice. The clerk of the court shall send to Plaintiff:a. a civil-rights complaint form for use by prisoners; b. a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis for use by prisoners; and c. a Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate approved for use in the Northern District of Florida. On or before November 7, 2022, Plaintiff shall: a. file a notice of voluntary dismissal under Rule 41(a)(1)(A); or b. file an amended complaint, which must be typed or clearly written, submitted on the court-approved form, and titled "Second Amended Complaint or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal." If he elects to file a second amended complaint, on or before November 7, 2022, Plaintiff shall: a. pay the $402.00 fee to the clerk of the court; or b. submit a fully-completed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis with an attached Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate. (Filing Fee or IFP MOTION due by 11/7/2022. SECOND Amended COMPLAINT due by 11/7/2022.) (Forms mailed w/ORDER). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 10/7/2022. (mb) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
October 6, 2022 Filing 10 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by JOE HOPKINS. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
October 6, 2022 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by JOE HOPKINS. (No service copies filed.) (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
October 6, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #9 Amended Complaint, #10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. On or before October 5, 2022, Plaintiff shall explain and show cause why he failed to comply with this court's order. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order likely will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with a court order, failure to prosecute, failure to pay the filing fee, and failure to comply with the Local Rules. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 09/14/22. (Show Cause Response due by 10/5/2022.) (jfj) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for extension of time, Doc. #6, is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. On or before September 6, 2022, Plaintiff shall (1) file a notice of voluntary dismissal or an amended complaint; and, if he files an amended complaint, (2) pay the $402.00 fee or submit a fully-completed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in accordance with this courts order of June 21, 2022. Doc. #3. This court likely will not grant any further extensions of time. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order likely will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with an order of this court, failure to prosecute, failure to pay the filing fee, and failure to comply with the Local Rules. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 07/29/22. (jfj) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
July 29, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time by JOE HOPKINS. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jfj) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
July 29, 2022 Set Deadlines: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal or Amended Complaint due by 9/6/2022. Filing Fee or IFP Motion due by 9/6/2022. (jfj) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
July 28, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time by JOE HOPKINS. (jfj) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 8/5/2022, Plaintiff shall: (1) file a notice of voluntary dismissal or an amended complaint; and, if Plaintiff files an amended complaint, (2) pay the $402.00 fee or submit a fully-completed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in accordance with this courts order of July 1, 2022. Doc. #3. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 7/14/2022. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
July 14, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time re #3 Order by JOE HOPKINS. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
July 14, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time as to #3 Order. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Complaint. The clerk of the court shall send to Plaintiff:a. a civil-rights complaint form for use by prisoners; b. a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis for use by prisoners; and c. a Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate approved for use in the Northern District of Florida. On or before 7/21/2022, Plaintiff shall:a. file a notice of voluntary dismissal under Rule 41(a)(1)(A); orb. file an amended complaint, which must be typed or clearly written, submitted on the court-approved form, and titled "Amended Complaint." On or before 7/21/2022, Plaintiff shall:a. pay the $402.00 fee to the clerk of the court; or b. submit a fully-completed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis with an attached Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate signed by a prison official and a computer printout of the transactions in Plaintiff's inmate trust account during the six-month period of incarceration preceding the filing of this suit. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 6/21/2022. (jcw)(Forms sent as ordered.) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
June 21, 2022 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
June 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AVILAS, T BARTON, CENTURION OF FLORIDA LLC, CORIZON LLC, MICHELLE J DANIELS, ANGIE DEASON, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, HERNANDEZ, R JENKINS, ELLIOT PEREZ, ERNESTO L TOLEDO, TRIDENTCARE IMAGING, filed by JOE HOPKINS. (Filing fee was not paid. No service copies filed.) (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]
June 21, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopkins v. Florida Department of Corrections, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion of Florida, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tridentcare Imaging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avilas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle J Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernesto L. Toledo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Deason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?