IBEW Local Union No. 915 Pension-Annuity Fund et al v. Jam Electric, LLC
Plaintiff: IBEW Local Union No. 915 Pension-Annuity Fund, Randall King, Kenny Wooton, Vance Anderson, Sean McDonald, Roberto Rosa, Tony Greco, IBEW Local Union No. 915 Health and Welfare Fund, Tampa Area Electrical JATC, Local 915 of The International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Shawn McDonnell and Tony Grieco
Defendant: Jam Electric, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Lansing C. Scriven
Case Number: 8:2023cv00452
Filed: March 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2023 Filing 18 RETURN of service executed on 4/14/23 by Shawn McDonnell, Local 915 of The International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Randall King, Roberto Rosa, IBEW Local Union No. 915 Health and Welfare Fund, IBEW Local Union No. 915 Pension-Annuity Fund, Tony Grieco, Kenny Wooton, Tampa Area Electrical JATC, Vance Anderson as to Jam Electric, LLC. (Venable, Patrick)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot and without prejudice #15 Motion for Clerk's Default. See Notice at docket #16. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 4/11/2023. (CCB)
April 11, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE by Tony Grieco, IBEW Local Union No. 915 Health and Welfare Fund, IBEW Local Union No. 915 Pension-Annuity Fund, Kenny Wooton, Local 915 of The International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Shawn McDonnell, Randall King, Roberto Rosa, Tampa Area Electrical JATC, Vance Anderson of mistaken filing (Venable, Patrick)
April 10, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Jam Electric, LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support)(Venable, Patrick)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #13 Motion for Clerk's Default> Plaintiff must serve the registered agent listed in sunbiz.org. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 4/10/2023. (Jung, William)
April 10, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Jam Electric, LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support)(Venable, Patrick)
March 23, 2023 Filing 12 RETURN of Summons Executed by Tony Grieco, IBEW Local Union No. 915 Health and Welfare Fund, IBEW Local Union No. 915 Pension-Annuity Fund, Kenny Wooton, Local 915 of The International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Shawn McDonnell, Randall King, Roberto Rosa, Lansing C. Scriven, Tampa Area Electrical JATC, Vance Anderson . (Venable, Patrick) Modified text on 3/23/2023 (SET).
March 15, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tony Grieco, IBEW Local Union No. 915 Health and Welfare Fund, IBEW Local Union No. 915 Pension-Annuity Fund, Kenny Wooton, Local 915 of The International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Shawn McDonnell, Randall King, Roberto Rosa, Tampa Area Electrical JATC, Vance Anderson. (Venable, Patrick) Modified text on 3/16/2023 (SET).
March 15, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of a related action by Plaintiffs per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Tony Grieco, IBEW Local Union No. 915 Health and Welfare Fund, IBEW Local Union No. 915 Pension-Annuity Fund, Kenny Wooton, Local 915 of The International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Shawn McDonnell, Randall King, Roberto Rosa, Tampa Area Electrical JATC, Vance Anderson. Related case(s): No (Venable, Patrick)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER appointing Lansing C. Scriven as mediator in this action. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/10/2023. (CCB)
March 10, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of lead counsel designation by Tony Grieco, IBEW Local Union No. 915 Health and Welfare Fund, IBEW Local Union No. 915 Pension-Annuity Fund, Kenny Wooton, Local 915 of The International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Shawn McDonnell, Randall King, Roberto Rosa, Tampa Area Electrical JATC, Vance Anderson (Venable, Patrick) Modified text on 3/13/2023 (SET).
March 10, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick A. Venable on behalf of Tony Grieco, IBEW Local Union No. 915 Health and Welfare Fund, IBEW Local Union No. 915 Pension-Annuity Fund, Kenny Wooton, Local 915 of The International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Shawn McDonnell, Randall King, Roberto Rosa, Tampa Area Electrical JATC, Vance Anderson (Venable, Patrick)
March 10, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SET)
March 3, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH)
March 3, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH)
March 2, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Jam Electric, LLC. (SET)
March 1, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:23-cv-0452-WFJ-AAS. (SJB)
March 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jam Electric, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20562776) filed by Sean McDonald, Local 915 of The International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Randall King, Roberto Rosa, IBEW Local Union No. 915 Health and Welfare Fund, IBEW Local Union No. 915 Pension-Annuity Fund, Tony Greco, Kenny Wooton, Tampa Area Electrical JATC, Vance Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Summons)(Venable, Patrick) Modified text on 3/2/2023 (SET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IBEW Local Union No. 915 Pension-Annuity Fund et al v. Jam Electric, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local Union No. 915 Pension-Annuity Fund
Represented By: Patrick A. Venable
Represented By: W. Eric Venable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall King
Represented By: Patrick A. Venable
Represented By: W. Eric Venable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Wooton
Represented By: Patrick A. Venable
Represented By: W. Eric Venable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vance Anderson
Represented By: Patrick A. Venable
Represented By: W. Eric Venable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean McDonald
Represented By: Patrick A. Venable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Rosa
Represented By: Patrick A. Venable
Represented By: W. Eric Venable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Greco
Represented By: Patrick A. Venable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local Union No. 915 Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Patrick A. Venable
Represented By: W. Eric Venable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tampa Area Electrical JATC
Represented By: Patrick A. Venable
Represented By: W. Eric Venable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 915 of The International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Patrick A. Venable
Represented By: W. Eric Venable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn McDonnell
Represented By: W. Eric Venable
Represented By: Patrick A. Venable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Grieco
Represented By: W. Eric Venable
Represented By: Patrick A. Venable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jam Electric, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Lansing C. Scriven
Represented By: Lansing C. Scriven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?