Foundever Operating Corporation v. Hahn
Plaintiff: Foundever Operating Corporation
Defendant: Hilary Hahn
Case Number: 8:2023cv01495
Filed: July 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2023 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Memorandum of Law filed by Hilary Hahn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2023-08-14 Email from Vorhees, #2 Exhibit 2023-08-18 Email from Vorhees)(Barack, Ryan)
August 31, 2023 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Hilary Hahn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Hahn, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Danter)(Barack, Ryan)
August 21, 2023 Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Vorhees, Robert)
August 18, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Memorandum of Law by Foundever Operating Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Plaintiff's First Set of Expedited Interrogatories to Defendant)(Vorhees, Robert)
August 16, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE OF HEARING: ORAL ARGUMENT set for 9/7/2023 at 03:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13 A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. (CAB)
August 16, 2023 Filing 18 Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell: ZOOM STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/16/2023. Court Reporter: Sharon A. Miller (CAB)
August 16, 2023 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Case management report due by 8/21/2023. (LAB)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report. Plaintiff may file the Case Management Report on or before August 21, 2023. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/14/2023. (MMS)
August 14, 2023 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report by Foundever Operating Corporation. (Vorhees, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate.
August 11, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Conference set for Wednesday, August 16, 2023, at 2:00 PM via Zoom Video Conference before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. The Court will discuss Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 14) and the scheduling of an evidentiary hearing, if needed. The Clerk will send counsel a Zoom invitation via email. (CAB)
August 4, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support by Foundever Operating Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Declaration of Erin Wallace, #2 Exhibit 2: Declaration of Allan N. Buxton, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Vorhees, Robert)
August 1, 2023 Filing 13 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 8:23-cv-1495-CEH-UAM. Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy no longer assigned to the case. (AG)
July 26, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Foundever Operating Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Foundever Group S.A. for Foundever Operating Corporation. (McCormack, J.)
July 26, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Foundever Operating Corporation. Related case(s): No (McCormack, J.)
July 20, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Hilary Hahn. Related case(s): No (Barack, Ryan)
July 20, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Hilary Hahn. (Barack, Ryan)
July 20, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAB)
July 20, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAB)
July 14, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hilary Hahn.(Barack, Ryan)
July 6, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by J. Robert McCormack on behalf of Foundever Operating Corporation. Lead Counsel: J. Robert McCormack. (McCormack, J.)
July 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Ryan D. Barack on behalf of Hilary Hahn. Lead Counsel: Ryan D. Barack. (Barack, Ryan)
July 6, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MCB)
July 5, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 8:23-cv-1495-CEH-MRM. (ABC)
July 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsborough Circuit Court, case number 23-CA-012443 filed in State Court on 5/10/2023. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-21009177 filed by Hilary Hahn. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit Motion for Extension of Time to File Response, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit B - Declaration of Hahn)(Barack, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foundever Operating Corporation v. Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foundever Operating Corporation
Represented By: J. Robert McCormack
Represented By: Robert Vorhees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilary Hahn
Represented By: Michelle E. Nadeau
Represented By: Ryan D. Barack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?