City of Plant City v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: City of Plant City
Defendant: 3M Company, AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc., Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., Archroma Management, LLC, Archroma U.S., Inc., Arkema Inc., BASF Corporation, Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Carrier Global Corporation, Central Sprinkler, LLC, ChemDesign Products, Inc., Chemguard, Inc., Chemicals Incorporated, Chubb Fire, Ltd., Clariant Corporation, Corteva, Inc., Deepwater Chemicals, Inc., John Doe 1-49, DuPont De Nemours, Inc., Dynax Corporation, E.I. Dupont de Mours and Company, Fire Products GP Holding, LLC, Johnson Controls International plc, Kidde PLC, Inc., Nation Ford Chemical Company, National Foam, Inc., Raytheon Technologies Corporation, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Tyco Fire Products L.P., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., AGC, Inc., Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co., Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, United Technologies Corporation, Tyco Fire Products LP and Asahi Glass Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 8:2023cv01597
Filed: July 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2023 Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the District of South Carolina as case 2:23-cv-04188, filed 08/21/2023. (JNB)
August 21, 2023 Filing 17 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: District of South Carolina. MDL case number: 2873. (AG)
August 14, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP Notice of Filing Conditional Transfer Order from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Conditional Transfer Order (Finalized))(Sloan, Michael)
August 14, 2023 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 11 Order #5 Standing Order by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc. for Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Sloan, Michael)
August 7, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by City of Plant City. Related case(s): No (Caro, Louise)
August 7, 2023 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by City of Plant City. (Caro, Louise)
August 7, 2023 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Caro, Louise)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER: Tyco Fire Products' and Chemguard's #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement fails to meet the standards this Court requires to effectively screen cases for potential conflicts. The Court requires parties to disclose "ownership however small of a party's shares or stock," not simply those whose ownership constitutes 10% or more. See (Doc. #5) at 8. Tyco Fire Products and Chemguard must file a new statement using the form attached to the #5 Civil Case Order (also available on the undersigned's website) by August 14, 2023. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 8/7/2023. (JMP)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER: The #5 Civil Case Order requires the parties to submit a notice of related actions and corporate disclosure statements within fourteen days after appearing. Plant City fails to submit a corporate disclosure statement, and the parties fail to submit a notice of related actions. The parties must submit the requisite documents no later than August 14, 2023. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 8/7/2023. (JMP)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER: Plant City's complaint, (Doc. 1-1), is a shotgun pleading because Counts II through VII "reallege[] and reaffirm[] all allegations set forth in the preceding paragraphs." Id.; see Weiland v. Palm Beach Cnty. Sheriff's Off., 792 F.3d 1313, 1321 (11th Cir. 2015) ("The most common type [of shotgun pleading]--by a long shot--is a complaint containing multiple counts where each count adopts the allegations of all preceding counts, causing each successive count to carry all that came before and the last count to be a combination of the entire complaint."). Accordingly, Plant City's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plant City must submit an amended complaint no later than August 14, 2023. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 8/7/2023. (JMP)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Tyco Fire Products and Chemguard must answer the Plaintiff's complaint no later than twenty-eight days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a decision on the transfer of this action to In re Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation, Case No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (D.S.C.). Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 7/21/2023. (JMP)
July 21, 2023 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File response to Complaint by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Sloan, Michael)
July 21, 2023 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc. for Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sloan, Michael) Modified on 7/21/2023 to edit text (ABC).
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL CASE ORDER. The parties shall meet and file a Case Management Report using the standard form on the Court's website within forty days after removal. Each party must also file a Corporate Disclosure Statement using the standard template attached to this Order (also available on the undersigned's website under the "forms" tab) within fourteen days after appearing. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 7/20/2023. (JMP)
July 18, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Heidi Levine, Keith Bensten, Jonathan Handler, Michael Sloan, Melanie Black Dubis, Charles Raynal IV, Brent Dwerlkotte, David Erickson, Tyler Alfermann, Daniel Ring, John Wellshlager, John Parker, Oliver Twaddell, Kat Hacker, Ethan Ware, Clifford Zatz, Kurt Douglas Weaver, Clifton Brinson, Addie Ries, Kirk Warner, and Keith Smith Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ABC)
July 18, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Louise R. Caro and Laura Jacobs Donaldson of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ABC)
July 17, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:23-cv-1597-KKM-CPT. (ABC)
July 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from City of Plant City v 3M Company, case number 23-CA-012738 filed in State Court on 05/24/2023. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-21049108 filed by Tyco Fire Products L.P.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sloan, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Plant City v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Plant City
Represented By: Laura Jacobs Donaldson
Represented By: Louise R. Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angus International Safety Group, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archroma Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archroma U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Global Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Sprinkler, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChemDesign Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard, Inc.
Represented By: Michael David Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemicals Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Fire, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clariant Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-49
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DuPont De Nemours, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynax Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Dupont de Mours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire Products GP Holding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls International plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nation Ford Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company FC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products L.P.
Represented By: Michael David Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Michael David Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asahi Glass Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?