Panini America, Inc. v. Fanatics, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Panini America, Inc.
Defendant: Fanatics, Inc, Fanatics, LLC, Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc., Fanatics SPV, LLC and Fanatics Holdings Inc.
Case Number: 8:2023cv01721
Filed: August 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Antitrust
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ENDORSED ORDER: Finding good cause, the Court grants the parties' #65 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's amended complaint or response to the motion to dismiss is due October 10, 2023. The parties' case management report is due October 17, 2023. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 9/28/2023. (ALE)
September 28, 2023 Filing 65 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint And For Extension Of Time To File Case Management Report by All Plaintiffs. (Singer, Stuart) Modified text on 9/29/2023 (KME).
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ENDORSED ORDER: Finding good cause, the Court grants the parties' #63 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' case management report is due September 29, 2023. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 9/26/2023. (ALE)
September 25, 2023 Filing 63 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report by All Defendants. (Schifino, William)
September 11, 2023 Filing 62 REQUEST for oral argument re #61 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc., Fanatics Holdings Inc., Fanatics SPV, LLC, Fanatics, Inc, Fanatics, LLC. (Buterman, Lawrence)
September 11, 2023 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc., Fanatics Holdings Inc., Fanatics SPV, LLC, Fanatics, Inc, Fanatics, LLC. (Buterman, Lawrence)
September 1, 2023 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Christopher S. Yates re #59 Reply to Response to Motion by Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc., Fanatics Holdings Inc., Fanatics SPV, LLC, Fanatics, Inc, Fanatics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit 3)(Buterman, Lawrence)
September 1, 2023 Filing 59 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case filed by Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc., Fanatics Holdings Inc., Fanatics SPV, LLC, Fanatics, Inc, Fanatics, LLC. (Buterman, Lawrence)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ENDORSED ORDER: The Defendants' #57 Motion for Leave to File a Reply is GRANTED. By September 6, 2023, the Defendants may file a Reply in Support of their Motion to Transfer not to exceed six pages. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 8/31/2023. (ALE)
August 30, 2023 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document: Reply to #49 Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer by Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc., Fanatics Holdings Inc., Fanatics SPV, LLC, Fanatics, Inc, Fanatics, LLC. (Buterman, Lawrence) Modified text and linked proper docket on 8/31/2023 (GL).
August 29, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE of compliance re 36 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc., Fanatics Holdings Inc., Fanatics SPV, LLC, Fanatics, Inc, Fanatics, LLC (Schifino, William)
August 28, 2023 Filing 55 RETURN of service executed on 08/10/2023 by Panini America, Inc. as to Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit 2023-08-07 Return of Process FANATICS COLLECTIBLES INTERMEDIATE HOLDCO, INC., #2 Affidavit 2023-08-08 Return of Service FANATICS COLLECTIBLES INTERMEDIATE HOLDCO, INC)(Singer, Stuart)
August 28, 2023 Filing 54 RETURN of service executed on 08/07/2023 by Panini America, Inc. as to Fanatics, LLC. (Singer, Stuart)
August 28, 2023 Filing 53 RETURN of service executed on 08/07/2023 by Panini America, Inc. as to Fanatics, Inc. (Singer, Stuart)
August 28, 2023 Filing 52 RETURN of service executed on 08/07/2023 by Panini America, Inc. as to Fanatics SPV, LLC. (Singer, Stuart)
August 28, 2023 Filing 51 RETURN of service executed on 08/07/2023 by Panini America, Inc. as to Fanatics Holdings Inc.. (Singer, Stuart)
August 28, 2023 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Jason Hilborn re #49 Memorandum in opposition by Panini America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68)(Singer, Stuart)
August 28, 2023 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #24 Motion to Change Venue / Transfer Case filed by Panini America, Inc.. (Singer, Stuart)
August 25, 2023 Filing 48 **Contacted counsel to refile using correct event code: summons returned executed per defendant** PROOF of service by Panini America, Inc. (Singer, Stuart) Modified text on 8/28/2023 (MCB).
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ENDORSED ORDER: Finding good cause, the Court GRANTS the Defendants' #45 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. By September 11, 2023, the Defendants must respond to the Plaintiff's complaint. The Defendants' #46 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Motion in Excess of Twenty-Five Pages is also GRANTED. The Defendants' motion in response to the complaint may not exceed thirty-five pages. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 8/25/2023. (ALE)
August 25, 2023 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION to File Excess Pages by All Defendants. (Schifino, William)
August 25, 2023 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint (Motion for Extensions of the August 28, 2023 and August 31, 2023 Deadlines) by All Defendants. (Schifino, William)
August 24, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE of compliance re 12 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Panini America, Inc. (Singer, Stuart)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: The Defendants' #27 Motion to Stay is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 8/24/2023. (ALE)
August 21, 2023 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #27 Motion to Stay filed by Panini America, Inc.. (Singer, Stuart)
August 21, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Michael Panuccio on behalf of Panini America, Inc. (Panuccio, Jesse)
August 17, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Jane Barney on behalf of Panini America, Inc. (Barney, Sarah)
August 17, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by John Ernest Clabby on behalf of Panini America, Inc. (Clabby, John)
August 17, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by David Matthew Allen on behalf of Panini America, Inc. (Allen, David)
August 17, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Lee Sasso on behalf of Panini America, Inc. (Sasso, Gary)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ENDORSED ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Michael B. Carlinsky, Christopher G. Michel, and Derek L. Shaffer may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, Counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 8/17/2023. (EPW)
August 17, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of compliance re 28 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc., Fanatics Holdings Inc., Fanatics SPV, LLC, Fanatics, Inc, Fanatics, LLC (Schifino, William)
August 17, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Panini America, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Singer, Stuart)
August 17, 2023 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Standing Order by Panini America, Inc.. (Singer, Stuart)
August 17, 2023 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Michael B. Carlinsky to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21158955 for $150 by All Defendants. (Schifino, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
August 17, 2023 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Christopher G. Michel to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21158935 for $150 by All Defendants. (Schifino, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
August 17, 2023 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Derek L. Shaffer to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21158919 for $150 by All Defendants. (Schifino, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ENDORSED ORDER: Panini America is directed to respond to the motion to stay #27 by August 21, 2023. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 8/15/2023. (MEV)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Christopher S. Yates, Amanda P. Reeves, and Lawrence E. Buterman may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, Counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 8/15/2023. (EPW)
August 14, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION to Stay Case pending resolution of Motion to Transfer by Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc., Fanatics Holdings Inc., Fanatics SPV, LLC, Fanatics, Inc, Fanatics, LLC. (Schifino, William) Modified to edit docket text on 8/15/2023 (HAI).
August 14, 2023 Filing 26 REQUEST for oral argument re #24 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case by Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc., Fanatics Holdings Inc., Fanatics SPV, LLC, Fanatics, Inc, Fanatics, LLC. (Schifino, William)
August 14, 2023 Filing 25 DECLARATION of LAWRENCE E. BUTERMAN re #24 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case by Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc., Fanatics Holdings Inc., Fanatics SPV, LLC, Fanatics, Inc, Fanatics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Schifino, William)
August 14, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case by Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc., Fanatics Holdings Inc., Fanatics SPV, LLC, Fanatics, Inc, Fanatics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Gregg Winiarski)(Schifino, William)
August 14, 2023 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Fanatics SPV, LLC. (Schifino, William)
August 14, 2023 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Fanatics, LLC. (Schifino, William)
August 14, 2023 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Fanatics, Inc. (Schifino, William)
August 14, 2023 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Fanatics Holdings Inc.. (Schifino, William)
August 14, 2023 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc.. (Schifino, William)
August 14, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc., Fanatics Holdings Inc., Fanatics SPV, LLC, Fanatics, Inc, Fanatics, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Schifino, William)
August 14, 2023 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Lawrence E. Buterman to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21147544 for $150 by Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc., Fanatics Holdings Inc., Fanatics SPV, LLC, Fanatics, Inc, Fanatics, LLC. (Schifino, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
August 14, 2023 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Amanda P. Reeves to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21147541 for $150 by Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc., Fanatics Holdings Inc., Fanatics SPV, LLC, Fanatics, Inc, Fanatics, LLC. (Schifino, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
August 14, 2023 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Christopher S. Yates to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21147540 for $150 by Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc., Fanatics Holdings Inc., Fanatics SPV, LLC, Fanatics, Inc, Fanatics, LLC. (Schifino, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
August 14, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by William J. Schifino, Jr on behalf of Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc., Fanatics Holdings Inc., Fanatics SPV, LLC, Fanatics, Inc, Fanatics, LLC. Lead Counsel: William J. Schifino, Jr.. (Schifino, William)
August 14, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Schifino, Jr on behalf of Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc., Fanatics Holdings Inc., Fanatics SPV, LLC, Fanatics, Inc, Fanatics, LLC (Schifino, William)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys David Boies, James Denvir, Richard Feinstein, and Sean Rodriguez may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff Panini America, Inc. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, Counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 8/10/2023. (EPW)
August 7, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Sean Rodriguez to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21123596 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cert.- Good Standing)(Singer, Stuart) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
August 7, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Richard Feinstein to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21123590 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cert.- Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Cert.-Good Standing)(Singer, Stuart) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
August 7, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for James Denvir to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21123588 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cert.- Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Cert.-Good Standing)(Singer, Stuart) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
August 7, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for David Boies to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21123420 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cert.-Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Cert.-Good Standing)(Singer, Stuart) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
August 4, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc., Fanatics Holdings Inc., Fanatics SPV, LLC, Fanatics, Inc, Fanatics, LLC. (ABC)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL CASE STANDING ORDER. The Parties shall meet and file a Case Management Report using the standard form on the Court's website within forty days after any Defendant appears. Each Party must also file a Corporate Disclosure Statement using the standard template attached to this Order (also available on the undersigned's website under the "forms" tab) within fourteen days after appearing. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 8/3/2023. (MEV)
August 3, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard Feinstein of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AA)
August 3, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL David Boies, James P Denvir, Richard Feinstein, Sean Phillips Rodriguez Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AA)
August 3, 2023 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:23-cv-0172-KKM-AEP. (AA)
August 3, 2023 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Panini America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Singer, Stuart) Modified on 8/3/2023 to edit text (ABC).
August 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21110069) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Singer, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Panini America, Inc. v. Fanatics, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Panini America, Inc.
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: James P Denvir
Represented By: Jason H. Hilborn
Represented By: Richard Feinstein
Represented By: Sabria McElroy
Represented By: Sean Phillips Rodriguez
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: David Matthew Allen
Represented By: Gary Lee Sasso
Represented By: James P Denvir, III
Represented By: Jesse Michael Panuccio
Represented By: John Ernest Clabby
Represented By: Richard A. Feinstein
Represented By: Sarah Jane Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fanatics, Inc
Represented By: William J. Schifino, Jr.
Represented By: Amanda P. Reeves
Represented By: Christopher G. Michel
Represented By: Christopher S. Yates
Represented By: Derek L. Shaffer
Represented By: Lawrence E. Buterman
Represented By: Michael B. Carlinsky
Represented By: Michael G. Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fanatics, LLC
Represented By: William J. Schifino, Jr.
Represented By: Amanda P. Reeves
Represented By: Derek L. Shaffer
Represented By: Lawrence E. Buterman
Represented By: Michael B. Carlinsky
Represented By: Michael G. Tanner
Represented By: Christopher G. Michel
Represented By: Christopher S. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc.
Represented By: William J. Schifino, Jr.
Represented By: Amanda P. Reeves
Represented By: Christopher G. Michel
Represented By: Christopher S. Yates
Represented By: Derek L. Shaffer
Represented By: Lawrence E. Buterman
Represented By: Michael B. Carlinsky
Represented By: Michael G. Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fanatics SPV, LLC
Represented By: William J. Schifino, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher S. Yates
Represented By: Derek L. Shaffer
Represented By: Lawrence E. Buterman
Represented By: Michael B. Carlinsky
Represented By: Michael G. Tanner
Represented By: Amanda P. Reeves
Represented By: Christopher G. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fanatics Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence E. Buterman
Represented By: Michael B. Carlinsky
Represented By: Michael G. Tanner
Represented By: William J. Schifino, Jr.
Represented By: Amanda P. Reeves
Represented By: Christopher G. Michel
Represented By: Christopher S. Yates
Represented By: Derek L. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?