Final Expense Direct v. Python Leads, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Final Expense Direct
Defendant: Python Leads, LLC, Jacquenly Levin, David Levin and Jacquelyn Leah Levin
Case Number: 8:2023cv02093
Filed: September 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Bryant S. Banes on behalf of Final Expense Direct. Lead Counsel: BRYANT S. BANES. (Banes, Bryant)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/5/2024. Dispositive motions due by 10/25/2024. Pretrial statement due by 2/6/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2025 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Jury Trial set for the March 2025 trial Term commencing 3/3/2025 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/1/2023. (CCB)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Bryant S Banes and Brian Koji of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Bryant S Banes Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery is due by 7/5/2024. Dispositive motions are due by 10/25/2024. Pretrial statement due by 2/1/2024. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 2/8/2024 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Jury Trial is set for the March 2025 trial Term commencing 3/5/2025 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/1/2023. (JCG)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Koji, Brian)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/20/23 by Final Expense Direct as to Jacquelyn Leah Levin. (Koji, Brian). Modified text on 9/21/2023 (GL).
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/20/23 by Final Expense Direct as to David Levin. (Koji, Brian). Modified text on 9/21/2023 (GL).
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/20/23 by Final Expense Direct as to Python Leads, LLC. (Koji, Brian). Modified image on 9/21/2023 (GL).
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Final Expense Direct. (Koji, Brian)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Final Expense Direct. Related case(s): Yes (Koji, Brian)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS issued as to Python Leads, LLC. (BGR)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Jacquelyn Leah Levin. (BGR)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to David Levin. (BGR)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Bryant S. Banes may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel submit his Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration (see https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers) within seven days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 9/18/2023. (BEE)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:23-cv-2093-WFJ-AAS. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Bryant S. Banes to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21256428 for $150 . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. (AA)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION for Bryant S. Banes to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21256428 for $150 by Final Expense Direct. (Koji, Brian) (Modified on 9/18/2023, to edit text) (BGR).
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21256350) filed by Final Expense Direct. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit P, #21 Exhibit Q, #22 Exhibit R, #23 Exhibit S, #24 Exhibit T, #25 Exhibit U)(Koji, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Final Expense Direct v. Python Leads, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Final Expense Direct
Represented By: Bryant S Banes
Represented By: Brian Koji
Represented By: Bryant S. Banes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Python Leads, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacquenly Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacquelyn Leah Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?