Flood v. GEICO General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gregory Scott Flood
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Not Classified By Court: Steven Strickland
Case Number: 8:2023cv02220
Filed: September 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER appointing Steven A. Strickland as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for January 29, 2024, at 9:30 AM. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/16/2023. (JAK)
November 14, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on January 29, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. before Steven A. Strickland, Esq. (Marino, Stephen) Modified on 11/15/2023 (CTR).
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/24/2023. (MEJ)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order Doc. #18, no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/24/2023. (MEJ)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2024 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for the December 2024 Trial Term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Conduct mediation hearing by 6/5/2024. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/24/2023. (MEJ)
October 20, 2023 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Gomez, Carlos)
October 12, 2023 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 3.03 by Gregory Scott Flood. (Marino, Stephen)
October 12, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Gregory Scott Flood. Related case(s): Yes (Marino, Stephen)
October 6, 2023 Filing 14 GEICO General Insurance Company's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by GEICO General Insurance Company.(Alexander, Megan)
October 6, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by GEICO General Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Alexander, Megan)
October 6, 2023 Filing 12 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by GEICO General Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY INC d/b/a GEICO, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for GEICO General Insurance Company.. (Gomez, Carlos)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by October 20, 2023, file a completed Case Management Report. The Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery in the vast majority of cases. If the parties believe that more than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. After the Case Management Report is filed, the Court will determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/3/2023. (JAK)
October 2, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Stephen A. Marino, Jr on behalf of Gregory Scott Flood. Lead Counsel: Stephen A. Marino, Jr.. (Marino, Stephen)
October 2, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.03, which requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
October 2, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), which requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
October 2, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER: The Court is aware of the notice entered in this case, explaining that Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the filing of a uniform case management report with forty or seventy days, depending on the circumstances of the case. However, under Local Rule 1.01(b), a judge can modify or suspend for all or part of an action the application of any rule, except Rule 1.05(a). This Court finds it beneficial to enter a fast-track scheduling order in certain categories of cases before entry of a case management and scheduling order. Additionally, in cases that are not fast-tracked, this Court finds it efficient to have the parties confer and file case management reports within 14 days after the defendant's responsive pleading is due or within 14 days after a case is removed to this Court. In light of this, the Court hereby suspends Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) in this case. At a time the Court deems appropriate, the Court will enter a further order in this case setting either a deadline to file a completed uniform case management report or various fast-track deadlines for the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/2/2023. (MEJ)
October 2, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
October 2, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jordan Marshall Thompson on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Jordan M. Thompson. (Thompson, Jordan)
October 2, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jordan Marshall Thompson, Carlos G. Gomez, Megan Alexander, Stephen A. Marino, Jr., and Michael William Hoffman of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
September 29, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:23-cv-2220-VMC-JSS. (ARC)
September 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 13th Judicial Circuit Court, Hillsborough County Clerk of Court, case number 2023-CA-006198 filed in State Court on 03/21/2023. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-21307107 filed by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 State Court COMPLAINT, #8 State Court Docket Sheet, #9 State Court Other Documents, #10 Civil Cover Sheet )(Alexander, Megan) Modified text on 10/2/2023 (GL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flood v. GEICO General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Scott Flood
Represented By: Michael William Hoffman
Represented By: Stephen A. Marino, Jr.
Represented By: Graciana Marie Berlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Carlos G. Gomez
Represented By: Jordan Marshall Thompson
Represented By: Megan Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Steven Strickland
Represented By: Steven A. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?