VRA Enterprises, LLC v. The Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services et al
Plaintiff: VRA Enterprises, LLC doing business as Precision RX
Defendant: The Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services, The United States Department of Health and Human Services Office of Inspector General, The United States Department of Justice, The United States Office of Management and Budget and Civil Process Clerk US Attorney's Office for the Middle District of Florida
Case Number: 8:2023cv02474
Filed: October 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2023 Filing 20 RETURN of service executed on December 20, 2023 by VRA Enterprises, LLC as to Civil Process Clerk US Attorney's Office for the Middle District of Florida. (Mehta, Jason)
December 22, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS issued as to The United States Department of Justice Criminal Division. (BGR)
December 22, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS issued as to The United States Department of Justice Civil Division. (BGR)
December 21, 2023 Filing 17 PROPOSED summons to be issued by VRA Enterprises, LLC. (Mehta, Jason)
December 21, 2023 Filing 16 PROPOSED summons to be issued by VRA Enterprises, LLC. (Mehta, Jason)
December 18, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Attorney. (JK)
December 15, 2023 Filing 14 PROPOSED summons to be issued by VRA Enterprises, LLC. (Mehta, Jason)
December 1, 2023 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on November 28, 2023 by VRA Enterprises, LLC as to The United States Office of Management and Budget. (Mehta, Jason)
December 1, 2023 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on November 13, 2023 by VRA Enterprises, LLC as to The United States Department of Justice. (Mehta, Jason)
December 1, 2023 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on November 17, 2023 by VRA Enterprises, LLC as to The United States Department of Health and Human Services Office of Inspector General. (Mehta, Jason)
December 1, 2023 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on November 13, 2023 by VRA Enterprises, LLC as to The Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services. (Mehta, Jason)
November 10, 2023 Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by VRA Enterprises, LLC. (Mehta, Jason)
November 10, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by VRA Enterprises, LLC. Related case(s): No (Mehta, Jason)
November 6, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to The Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services, The United States Department of Health and Human Services Office of Inspector General, The United States Department of Justice, The United States Office of Management and Budget. (HAI)
November 3, 2023 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by VRA Enterprises, LLC. (Mehta, Jason)
October 31, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG)
October 31, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER regarding Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/30/2023. (KMN)
October 30, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:23-cv-2474-WFJ-TGW. (AA)
October 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Freedom of Information Act) against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21404798) filed by VRA Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, #2 Exhibit B - United States Office of Management and Budget, #3 Exhibit C - Department of Health and Human Services Office of Inspector General, #4 Exhibit D - United States Department of Justice, #5 Exhibit E - United States Department of Justice (Criminal), #6 Exhibit F - Oct 17, 2023 response from Stefanie Jewitt, Director of FOIA, #7 Exhibit G - Oct 27, 2023 response from Christina Butler, Chief of FOIA PA, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mehta, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VRA Enterprises, LLC v. The Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VRA Enterprises, LLC doing business as Precision RX
Represented By: Jason Paul Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Department of Health and Human Services Office of Inspector General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Office of Management and Budget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Civil Process Clerk US Attorney's Office for the Middle District of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?