Murphy v. Bank of America Corporation Corporate Benefits Committee et al
Plaintiff: Justin Murphy
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation Corporate Benefits Committee and Sedgwick Claims Management Service, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Stacy Estes Yates
Case Number: 8:2023cv02644
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Natalie Hirt Adams
Referring Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Bank of America Corporation Corporate Benefits Committee, Sedgwick Claims Management Service, Inc. Related case(s): No (Segalini, Stephanie) Modified on 1/9/2024 (JS).
January 9, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Stephanie A. Segalini on behalf of Bank of America Corporation Corporate Benefits Committee, Sedgwick Claims Management Service, Inc. Lead Counsel: Stephanie A. Segalini. (Segalini, Stephanie) Modified text on 1/9/2024 (KME).
January 3, 2024 Filing 14 Case Reassigned to US Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams. New case number: 8:23-cv-02644-WFJ-NHA. Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate no longer assigned to the case. (SAO)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting unopposed #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Bank of America Corporation Corporate Benefits Committee and Sedgwick Claims Management Service, Inc.'s answer or response due 1/18/2024. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/15/2023. (CCB)
December 15, 2023 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Bank of America Corporation Corporate Benefits Committee, Sedgwick Claims Management Service, Inc.. (Segalini, Stephanie)
December 7, 2023 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 11/28/2023 by Justin Murphy as to Bank of America Corporation Corporate Benefits Committee. (Demas, William)
December 7, 2023 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 11/28/2023 by Justin Murphy as to Sedgwick Claims Management Service, Inc.. (Demas, William)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER appointing Stacy Estes Yates as mediator in this action. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/21/2023. (CCB)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG)
November 21, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG)
November 20, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Bank of America Corporation Corporate Benefits Committee, Sedgwick Claims Management Service, Inc. (GL)
November 20, 2023 Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 8:23-cv-2644-WFJ-UAM. (AA)
November 17, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Justin Murphy. (Demas, William)
November 17, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Justin Murphy. Related case(s): No. (Demas, William) Modified text on 11/20/2023 (GL).
November 17, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jason A. Herman on behalf of Justin Murphy. Lead Counsel: William Demas. (Herman, Jason)
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21478516) filed by Justin Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit STD Plan, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Sedgwick, #4 Proposed Summons BOA)(Herman, Jason) Modified text on 11/20/2023 (GL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Bank of America Corporation Corporate Benefits Committee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Murphy
Represented By: William Chris Demas
Represented By: Jason A. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation Corporate Benefits Committee
Represented By: Stephanie A. Segalini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Service, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie A. Segalini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Stacy Estes Yates
Represented By: Stacy Estes Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?