Knighten v. Charter Communications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lacorey Knighten
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc. and Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2023cv02669
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1131 ERISA - Collection of Delinquent Trust Funds
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Filing 24 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case by Charter Communications, Inc. (Rose, Jonathan) Modified on 1/19/2024 (CTR).
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on January 5, 2024. (PNT)
January 4, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jonathan Rose Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JS)
January 3, 2024 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Standing Order by Charter Communications, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Liberty Broadband Corporation for Charter Communications, Inc. (Espinosa, Jose) Modified docket text on 1/4/2024 (JS).
January 3, 2024 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Jonathan Gary Rose to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21620591 for $150 by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Espinosa, Jose) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
December 22, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Carl L. Rowley of Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
December 21, 2023 Filing 18 Charter Communications, LLC's #17 motion for an extension of time to respond is GRANTED. Charter Communications must respond to the #1 complaint no later than January 19, 2024. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 12/21/2023. (CMM)
December 21, 2023 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Rowley, Carl)
December 21, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl L. Rowley on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc. (Rowley, Carl)
December 20, 2023 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Furman, Wendy)
December 20, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Furman, Wendy)
December 20, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Wendy L. Furman on behalf of Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Wendy L. Furman. (Furman, Wendy)
December 20, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Shure Ploshnick on behalf of Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Ploshnick, Danielle)
December 20, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Furman, Wendy)
December 4, 2023 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 11/30/2023 by Lacorey Knighten as to Charter Communications, Inc. (Hill, Herbert) Modified text on 12/5/2023 (MCB).
November 30, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Standing Order by Lacorey Knighten. (Hill, Herbert)
November 30, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lacorey Knighten. Related case(s): No (Hill, Herbert)
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 11/29/2023 by Lacorey Knighten as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Hill, Herbert)
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Herbert Michael Hill on behalf of Lacorey Knighten. Lead Counsel: Herbert M. Hill, Esquire. (Hill, Herbert)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL CASE STANDING ORDER. Each party must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement using the standard template on the undersigned's website under the "forms" tab within fourteen days after appearing. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 11/22/2023. (CMM)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Michael Woodard and Herbert Hill of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Charter Communications, Inc., Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (ARL)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:23-cv-2669-KKM-JSS. (ARC)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21488509) filed by Lacorey Knighten. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Proposed Summons re: Charter, #12 Proposed Summons re: Lincoln)(Hill, Herbert) Modified on 11/22/2023 as to docket text (ARL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knighten v. Charter Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacorey Knighten
Represented By: Herbert Michael Hill
Represented By: Michael Ann Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Gary Rose
Represented By: Carl L. Rowley
Represented By: Jose M. Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Wendy L. Furman
Represented By: Danielle Shure Ploshnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?