Nilaj v. MGO Labs, LLC et al
Plaintiff: John Nilaj
Defendant: MGO Labs, LLC, DO Enterprises, LLC, 18th&Main, INC. and Danny Ortega
Not Classified By Court: Stacy Estes Yates
Case Number: 8:2023cv02671
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Natalie Hirt Adams
Referring Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Filing 33 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by 18th&Main, Inc., DO Enterprises, LLC, MGO Labs, LLC, Danny Ortega. (Ershock, Alex)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ENDORSED ORDER denying #31 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The complaint surmounts the low bar of notice pleading. Whether the jurisdictional impediments exist in Plaintiff's case may be explored on the merits. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 1/11/2024. (Jung, William)
January 5, 2024 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Defendants. (Ershock, Alex)
January 3, 2024 Filing 30 Case Reassigned to US Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams. New case number: 8:23-cv-02671-WFJ-NHA. Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate no longer assigned to the case. (SAO)
January 3, 2024 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by John Nilaj.(Clause, George)
December 29, 2023 Filing 28 ***INCORRECT EVENT. COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE WITH THE PROPER EVENT "AMENDED COMPLAINT" *** AMENDED document by John Nilaj. Amended Complaint. (Clause, George) Modified on 1/2/2024 (LSS).
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiff's unopposed #26 Motion to Amend complaint. Plaintiff shall file the Amended Complaint as a standalone entry on the docket. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/28/2023. (CCB)
December 27, 2023 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint by John Nilaj. (Clause, George)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendants' unopposed #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the complaint. Response due by 1/6/2024. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/21/2023. (CCB)
December 21, 2023 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Ershock, Alex)
December 20, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Brandon Claude Ershock on behalf of 18th&Main, Inc., DO Enterprises, LLC, MGO Labs, LLC, Danny Ortega (Ershock, Alex)
December 20, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Robin I. Frank on behalf of 18th&Main, Inc., DO Enterprises, LLC, MGO Labs, LLC, Danny Ortega (Frank, Robin)
December 20, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Daniel Ross Levine on behalf of 18th&Main, Inc., DO Enterprises, LLC, MGO Labs, LLC, Danny Ortega. Lead Counsel: Daniel R Levine. (Levine, Daniel)
December 20, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Ross Levine on behalf of 18th&Main, Inc., DO Enterprises, LLC, MGO Labs, LLC, Danny Ortega (Levine, Daniel)
December 18, 2023 Filing 19 RETURN of Service Executed on 12/11/2023 as to Do Enterprises, LLC by John Nilaj (Clause, George) Modified text on 12/19/2023 (BD).
December 18, 2023 Filing 18 RETURN of Service Executed on 12/11/2023 as to 18th&Main, Inc. by John Nilaj (Clause, George) Modified text on 12/19/2023 (BD).
December 18, 2023 Filing 17 RETURN of Service Executed on 12/11/2023 as to Danny Ortega by John Nilaj (Clause, George) Modified text on 12/19/2023 (BD).
December 18, 2023 Filing 16 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by John Nilaj. (Clause, George)
December 18, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by John Nilaj. Related case(s): No (Clause, George)
December 15, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by John Nilaj. Related case(s): No (Clause, George) Modified on 12/18/2023, Counsel contacted to refile due to incorrect case number (RN).
December 15, 2023 Filing 13 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by John Nilaj. (Clause, George) Modified on 12/18/2023, Counsel contacted to refile due to incorrect case number (RN).
December 15, 2023 Filing 12 ***INCORRECT EVENT CODE; COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE.***PROOF of service by John Nilaj (Clause, George) Modified on 12/18/2023 (LD).
December 15, 2023 Filing 11 ***INCORRECT EVENT CODE; COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE.***PROOF of service by John Nilaj (Clause, George) Modified on 12/18/2023 (LD).
December 15, 2023 Filing 10 ***INCORRECT EVENT CODE; COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE.*** PROOF of service by John Nilaj (Clause, George) Modified on 12/18/2023 (LD).
December 8, 2023 Filing 9 PROOF of service by John Nilaj (Clause, George)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER appointing Stacy Estes Yates as mediator in this action. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/27/2023. (CCB)
November 22, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to 18th&Main, Inc., DO Enterprises, LLC, MGO Labs, LLC, Danny Ortega. (GL)
November 22, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by John Nilaj (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons Flattened, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons Flattened, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons Flattened, #4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons Flattened)(Clause, George)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL George E. Clause II of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JG)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 8:23-cv-02671-WFJ-UAM. (JG)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21488970) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits A - C, #3 Proposed Summons MGO Labs, LLC, #4 Proposed Summons DO Enterprises, LLC, #5 Proposed Summons 18th&Main, Inc, #6 Proposed Summons Danny Ortega )(Clause, George) Modified text on 11/22/2023 (GL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nilaj v. MGO Labs, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Nilaj
Represented By: George Edward Clause, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGO Labs, LLC
Represented By: Robin I. Frank
Represented By: Daniel Ross Levine
Represented By: Alex Brandon Claude Ershock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DO Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Robin I. Frank
Represented By: Daniel Ross Levine
Represented By: Alex Brandon Claude Ershock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 18th&Main, INC.
Represented By: Daniel Ross Levine
Represented By: Alex Brandon Claude Ershock
Represented By: Robin I. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Ortega
Represented By: Daniel Ross Levine
Represented By: Alex Brandon Claude Ershock
Represented By: Robin I. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Stacy Estes Yates
Represented By: Stacy Estes Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?