Jacob et al v. Bais Yisroel Community Center of Tampa Bay, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: ALLAN JACOB and SANDRA JACOB
Defendant: BAIS YISROEL COMMUNITY CENTER OF TAMPA BAY, LLC,, YISRAEL TAUSSIG,, MALKA SINGER TAUSSIG, Bais Yisroel Community Center of Tampa Bay, LLC and Yisrael Taussig
Case Number: 8:2023cv02703
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 27 First MOTION for Default Judgment against Malka Singer Taussig, Yisrael Taussig by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service Yisrael Taussig, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service Malka Singer Taussig, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Teitelbaum, Rivka) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
January 10, 2024 Filing 26 PROOF of service by Allan Jacob (Teitelbaum, Rivka)
January 10, 2024 Filing 25 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Bais Yisroel Community Center of Tampa Bay, LLC. (ABC)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting #23 Motion for Clerk's Default. The Clerk is directed to enter default against Bais Yisroel Community Center of Tampa Bay, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 1/9/2024. (BEE)
January 9, 2024 Filing 23 First MOTION for Clerk's Default against Bais Yisroel Community Center of Tampa Bay, LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Teitelbaum, Rivka) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
December 26, 2023 Filing 22 PROOF of service by Allan Jacob (Teitelbaum, Rivka)
December 26, 2023 Filing 21 PROOF of service by Allan Jacob (Teitelbaum, Rivka)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Rivka Teitelbaum may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel submit their Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration within seven days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 12/8/2023. (BEE)
December 7, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Rivka Teitelbaum to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21539078 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Bitran, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
December 7, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Allan Jacob, Sandra Jacob. Related case(s): No. (Bitran, Daniel) Modified text on 12/8/2023 (GL).
December 7, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Rivka Teitelbaum Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Rivka Teitelbaum may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel submit their Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration (see https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers) within seven days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 12/6/2023. (BEE)
December 6, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allan Jacob, Sandra Jacob. (Bitran, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
December 6, 2023 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement by Allan Jacob, Sandra Jacob. (Bitran, Daniel)
December 6, 2023 Filing 13 ***INCORRECT EVENT CODE, COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE.*** NOTICE by Allan Jacob, Sandra Jacob re #5 Proposed summons, #3 Standing Order, 2 Case Assigned/Reassigned, #6 Proposed summons, #10 Proposed summons, #1 Complaint, #9 Proposed summons, #12 Summons issued, #11 Proposed summons, #7 Proposed summons, #8 Summons issued, #4 Notice (Other) NOTICE OF A RELATED ACTION (Bitran, Daniel) Modified on 12/7/2023 (LD).
December 1, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS issued as to Malka Singer Taussig, Yisrael Taussig. (MCB)
November 30, 2023 Filing 11 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Allan Jacob, Sandra Jacob. (Bitran, Daniel)
November 30, 2023 Filing 10 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Allan Jacob, Sandra Jacob. (Bitran, Daniel)
November 30, 2023 Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Allan Jacob, Sandra Jacob. (Bitran, Daniel)
November 30, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Bais Yisroel Community Center of Tampa Bay, LLC. (CTR)
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Allan Jacob, Sandra Jacob. (Bitran, Daniel)
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Allan Jacob, Sandra Jacob. (Bitran, Daniel)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Allan Jacob, Sandra Jacob. (Bitran, Daniel)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by Allan Jacob, Sandra Jacob re 2 Case Assigned/Reassigned, #1 Complaint. (Bitran, Daniel)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL CASE STANDING ORDER. The parties shall meet and file a Case Management Report using the standard form on the Court's website within forty days after any defendant appears. Each party must also file a Corporate Disclosure Statement using the standard template attached to this Order (also available on the undersigned's website under the "forms" tab) within fourteen days after appearing. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 11/28/2023. (ALE)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:23-cv-2703-KKM-AAS. (RLK)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21499321) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Bitran, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacob et al v. Bais Yisroel Community Center of Tampa Bay, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLAN JACOB
Represented By: Isaac Jaime Mitrani
Represented By: Daniel Steven Bitran
Represented By: Rivka Teitelbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA JACOB
Represented By: Isaac Jaime Mitrani
Represented By: Daniel Steven Bitran
Represented By: Rivka Teitelbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAIS YISROEL COMMUNITY CENTER OF TAMPA BAY, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YISRAEL TAUSSIG,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALKA SINGER TAUSSIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bais Yisroel Community Center of Tampa Bay, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yisrael Taussig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?