U.S. Bank, National Association v. Roesch et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, National Association
Defendant: Grow Financial Federal Credit Union, John Mark Roesch, 2427 Dean Street LLC, MacDill Federal Credit Union, Pinellas County Construction Licensing Board, Unknown Tenant No. 1 and Unknown Tenant No. 2
Case Number: 8:2024cv00351
Filed: February 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Christopher Lee Hixson of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #24 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. See Amended Motion at docket #25. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 4/3/2024. (CCB)
April 3, 2024 Filing 25 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by John Mark Roesch. (Hixson, Christopher)
April 1, 2024 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by John Mark Roesch. (Hixson, Christopher)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting unopposed #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. John Mark Roesch's answer or response due 4/1/2024. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/12/2024. (CCB)
March 11, 2024 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by John Mark Roesch. (Hixson, Christopher)
March 11, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Christopher Lee Hixson on behalf of John Mark Roesch. Lead Counsel: Christopher Hixson, Esq.. (Hixson, Christopher)
March 8, 2024 Filing 20 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Grow Financial Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McIver, Richard)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Motion re. scrivener's error. The lien at Doc. 1 par. 32 is BOOK 18826. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/7/2024. (Jung, William) Modified on 3/7/2024 (Jung, William).
March 6, 2024 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Correct Scrivener's Error by U.S. Bank, National Association. (McDonough, James) Modified text on 3/6/2024 (BD).
March 5, 2024 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 3 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule 3.03 by Grow Financial Federal Credit Union. (McIver, Richard)
March 5, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance as Lead Counsel by Richard Slaughter McIver on behalf of Grow Financial Federal Credit Union (McIver, Richard) Modified text on 3/6/2024 (BD).
February 27, 2024 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 02/26/2024 by U.S. Bank, National Association as to Pinellas County Construction Licensing Board. (McDonough, James)
February 27, 2024 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 02/15/2024 by U.S. Bank, National Association as to Grow Financial Federal Credit Union. (McDonough, James)
February 27, 2024 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 02/19/2024 by U.S. Bank, National Association as to John Mark Roesch. (McDonough, James)
February 8, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by James Kirby McDonough on behalf of U.S. Bank, National Association. Lead Counsel: J. Kirby McDonough. (McDonough, James)
February 7, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
February 7, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to 2427 Dean Street LLC, Grow Financial Federal Credit Union, Pinellas County Construction Licensing Board, John Mark Roesch. (GL)
February 7, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by U.S. Bank, National Association. Related case(s): Yes (McDonough, James)
February 7, 2024 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 3 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by U.S. Bank, National Association identifying Corporate Parent U.S. BANK, National Association, as Trustee for Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust, Inc., Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates for U.S. Bank, National Association. (McDonough, James)
February 7, 2024 Filing 7 AMENDED NOTICE of lis pendens by U.S. Bank, National Association (McDonough, James) Modified on 2/7/2024 to edit text. (LD).
February 7, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of lis pendens by U.S. Bank, National Association (McDonough, James)
February 6, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE by U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust, Inc., Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-AR9 re #1 Complaint [Plaintiff's Certification of Original Promissory Note] (McDonough, James)
February 6, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG)
February 6, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG)
February 6, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:24-cv-351-WFJ-AEP. (JCG)
February 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Foreclosure and Other Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21737656) filed by U.S. Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A - Original Note, #4 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #5 Exhibit C - Assignment of Mortgage, #6 Exhibit D - Power of Attorney, #7 Exhibit E - Notices of Default)(McDonough, James) Modified text on 2/6/2024 (GL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank, National Association v. Roesch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grow Financial Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Richard Slaughter McIver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mark Roesch
Represented By: Christopher Lee Hixson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2427 Dean Street LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MacDill Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Richard Slaughter McIver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinellas County Construction Licensing Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tenant No. 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tenant No. 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, National Association
Represented By: James Kirby McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?