Winsett et al v. Regions Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Frankie Winsett and Dana Winsett
Defendant: Regions Financial Corporation also known as Regions Bank doing business as Regions Mortgage, Regions Bank, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union LLC and Regions Financial Corporation a foreign for-profit corporation also known as Regions Bank doing business as Regions Mortgage
Case Number: 8:2024cv00601
Filed: March 7, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Steven D Merryday
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ENDORSED ORDER: Regions Financial Corporation again moves (Doc. 29) unopposed to extend the time within which Regions may answer the complaint. The motion is GRANTED. No later than May 9, 2024, Regions may answer the complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/25/2024. (AP)
April 25, 2024 Filing 31 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Long, Charlotte)
April 23, 2024 Filing 30 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Joffe, Jason)
April 23, 2024 Filing 29 Unopposed Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Regions Financial Corporation. (Paolini, Christopher) (Modified on 4/23/2024, to edit text) (BGR).
April 23, 2024 Filing 28 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Regions Financial Corporation. (Paolini, Christopher)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER: Regions Financial Corporation, Equifax Information Services LLC, and Trans Union LLC each move (Docs. 13, 21, and 24) unopposed to extend the time within which the defendant may respond to the complaint. Each motion is GRANTED. No later than April 25, 2024, each defendant may respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/4/2024. (AP)
April 3, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Trans Union LLC. Related case(s): No (Long, Charlotte)
April 3, 2024 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union LLC. (Long, Charlotte)
April 3, 2024 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Trans Union LLC. (Long, Charlotte)
April 3, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Charlotte A. Long on behalf of Trans Union LLC. Lead Counsel: Charlotte Long, Esq. (Long, Charlotte) Modified text on 4/4/2024 (MCB).
April 3, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Regions Financial Corporation. Related case(s): No (Paolini, Christopher)
April 3, 2024 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Regions Financial Corporation. (Paolini, Christopher)
April 3, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Mark Paolini on behalf of Regions Financial Corporation (Paolini, Christopher)
April 3, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Maria Helena Ruiz on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Maria H. Ruiz. (Ruiz, Maria)
April 3, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Related case(s): No (Ruiz, Maria) Modified docket text on 4/4/2024 (JOS).
April 3, 2024 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc., Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Ruiz, Maria) Modified docket text on 4/4/2024 (JOS).
April 3, 2024 Filing 16 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Ruiz, Maria)
April 3, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Equifax Information Services LLC. Related case(s): No (Joffe, Jason)
April 3, 2024 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Equifax Information Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC. (Joffe, Jason)
April 3, 2024 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Joffe, Jason)
April 3, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jason Daniel Joffe on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC. Lead Counsel: Jason Daniel Joffe. (Joffe, Jason)
March 28, 2024 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Dana Winsett, Frankie Winsett. (Dubbeld, Jon)
March 28, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Dana Winsett, Frankie Winsett. Related case(s): Yes (Dubbeld, Jon)
March 22, 2024 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 03.14.24 by Frankie Winsett, Dana Winsett as to Regions Financial Corporation. (Dubbeld, Jon)
March 22, 2024 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 03.14.24 by Frankie Winsett, Dana Winsett as to Trans Union LLC. (Dubbeld, Jon)
March 22, 2024 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 03.14.24 by Frankie Winsett, Dana Winsett as to Equifax Information Services LLC. (Dubbeld, Jon)
March 22, 2024 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 03.14.24 by Frankie Winsett, Dana Winsett as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Dubbeld, Jon) (Duplicate entry at doc. #5) Modified on 3/25/2024 to edit text. (ELM).
March 22, 2024 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 03.14.24 by Frankie Winsett, Dana Winsett as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Dubbeld, Jon) (Duplicate entry at doc. #6) Modified on 3/25/2024 to edit text. (ELM).
March 11, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (EJC)
March 8, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Regions Financial Corporation, Trans Union LLC. (JK)
March 7, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:24-cv-601-SDM-SPF. (RLK)
March 7, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Regions Financial Corporation, Trans Union LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21846292) filed by Frankie Winsett, Dana Winsett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit H, #14 Exhibit I, #15 Exhibit J, #16 Exhibit K, #17 Exhibit L)(Dubbeld, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winsett et al v. Regions Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Financial Corporation also known as Regions Bank doing business as Regions Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Bank
Represented By: Christopher Mark Paolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Jason Daniel Joffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Maria Helena Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Charlotte A. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Financial Corporation a foreign for-profit corporation also known as Regions Bank doing business as Regions Mortgage
Represented By: Christopher Mark Paolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie Winsett
Represented By: Aaron M. Swift
Represented By: Jordan Tyler Isringhaus
Represented By: Sean Edward McEleney
Represented By: Jon Paul Dubbeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Winsett
Represented By: Aaron M. Swift
Represented By: Jordan Tyler Isringhaus
Represented By: Sean Edward McEleney
Represented By: Jon Paul Dubbeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?