Ball v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Rohan Ball
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2024cv00932
Filed: April 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23 U.S.C. ยง 134 P.I.- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued as to United States of America. (AG)
May 31, 2024 FEE PAID. Filing fee for new civil case, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22149082 for $405 paid. (Gross, Paul)
May 21, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Rohan Ball. Related case(s): No (Gross, Paul)
May 17, 2024 Filing 7 (COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE. DOCUMENT MISSING CASE STYLE) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Rohan Ball. Related case(s): No (Gross, Paul) Modified text on 5/21/2024 (AA).
May 17, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Paul N. Gross on behalf of Rohan Ball. Lead Counsel: Paul Gross. (Gross, Paul)
April 18, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG)
April 18, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG)
April 17, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Paul N. Gross of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
April 17, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 8:24-cv-932-WFJ-UAM. (AJS)
April 17, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America with Jury Demand filed by Rohan Ball.(Gross, Paul) Modified text on 4/18/2024 (ABM). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2024: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (ABM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ball v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rohan Ball
Represented By: Paul N. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?