Williams v. United States of America
Petitioner: Alan Williams
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2024cv01152
Filed: May 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Alan Williams. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
June 6, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (HAI)
June 6, 2024 Filing 3 JUDGMENT entered denying Defendant's motion to vacate, set aside or correct sentence. ( Signed by Deputy Clerk) (HAI)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER denying #1 Motion to Vacate / Set Aside / Correct Sentence (2255). The CLERK is directed to enter a judgment against Williams, to terminate any pending motions, to CLOSE this case, and to enter a copy of this order in the criminal action. Leave to appeal in forma pauperis is DENIED. A certificate of appealability is DENIED. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/3/2024. (LSC)
May 13, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:21-cr-257-MSS-CPT filed by Alan Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Mailing Envelope)(AA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Diego Fontes Novaes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?