Epoch Properties, Inc. v. City of Palmetto
Plaintiff: Epoch Properties, Inc.
Defendant: City of Palmetto
Case Number: 8:2024cv01208
Filed: May 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Natalie Hirt Adams
Referring Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting unopposed/agreed #23 Motion to Strike Section III, beginning on page 18, of the motion filed at docket 19. Section III of the motion to stay and extend deadline #19 is hereby stricken. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/12/2024. (CCB)
July 11, 2024 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Strike #19 Time Sensitive MOTION to Stay Proceedings during Pendency of Related State Court Proceedings and to Extend the Deadline to Respond to the Complaint (Partial - Re: Section III) by Epoch Properties, Inc.. (Vogler, Matthew)
July 9, 2024 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 Time Sensitive MOTION to Stay Proceedings during Pendency of Related State Court Proceedings and to Extend the Deadline to Respond to the Complaint filed by Epoch Properties, Inc.. (Vogler, Matthew)
June 25, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing documents in support re #19 Time Sensitive MOTION to Stay Proceedings during Pendency of Related State Court Proceedings and to Extend the Deadline to Respond to the Complaint by City of Palmetto (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Daigneault, Jay) Modified text on 6/25/2024 (AM).
June 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER directing Epoch Properties, Inc. to respond to #19 Time Sensitive MOTION to Stay Proceedings during Pendency of Related State Court Proceedings. Response due by 7/9/2024. The motion to extend the deadline to respond to the Complaint is granted until further order of this Court. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/25/2024. (CCB)
June 24, 2024 Filing 19 Time Sensitive MOTION to Stay Proceedings during Pendency of Related State Court Proceedings and to Extend the Deadline to Respond to the Complaint by City of Palmetto. (Daigneault, Jay)
June 20, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of a related action Amended Notice per Local Rule 1.07(c) by City of Palmetto. Related case(s): Yes (Daigneault, Jay)
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting unopposed #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. City of Palmetto's answer or response due 6/28/2024. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/7/2024. (CCB)
June 7, 2024 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by City of Palmetto. (Daigneault, Jay)
June 4, 2024 Filing 15 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Epoch Properties, Inc. (Vogler, Matthew) Modified text on 6/6/2024 (AM).
June 4, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Matthew Edward Vogler on behalf of Epoch Properties, Inc. Lead Counsel: Matthew Edward Vogler. (Vogler, Matthew) Modified text on 6/5/2024 (GL).
June 4, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Edward Vogler on behalf of Epoch Properties, Inc. (Vogler, Matthew)
May 31, 2024 Filing 12 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by City of Palmetto. (Daigneault, Jay)
May 31, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by City of Palmetto. Related case(s): No (Daigneault, Jay)
May 31, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Randol D. Mora on behalf of City of Palmetto (Mora, Randol)
May 31, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jay Daigneault on behalf of City of Palmetto. Lead Counsel: Jay Daigneault. (Daigneault, Jay)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Matthew Edward Vogler may appear pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiff, subject to payment of the $150.00 special admission fee and submission of the Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration (see https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers) within seven days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams on 5/22/2024. (BPC)
May 21, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG)
May 21, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG)
May 20, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
May 20, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to City of Palmetto. (JK)
May 20, 2024 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams. New case number: 8:24-cv-1208-WFJ-NHA. (RLK)
May 17, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Matthew Edward Vogler to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22106402 for $150 by Epoch Properties, Inc.. (Vogler, Edward)
May 17, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Palmetto with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22106084) filed by Epoch Properties, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Proposed Summons)(Vogler, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epoch Properties, Inc. v. City of Palmetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epoch Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Edward Vogler
Represented By: Edward Vogler, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Palmetto
Represented By: Randol D. Mora
Represented By: Jay Daigneault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?