Symonette et al v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Maurice Symonette and Mack Wells
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Deutshe Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, HSBC Bank USA, National Association, Home Equityloan, Home Equity Loan Trust, Lancaster Mortgage Bankers, LLC, Homecomings Financial LLC and GMAC
Case Number: 8:2024cv01302
Filed: May 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (KAJ)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint is dismissed without prejudice as a shotgun pleading. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint no later than June 13, 2024. Failure to do so will result in dismissal without prejudice without further notice. In the light of this order, Plaintiffs' #2 Emergency Motion is DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiffs a copy of this order. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 5/30/2024. (ALE)
May 29, 2024 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Stop Eviction and Void Sale for Violation of Notice of Removal Stay using Forgery and Fraud by Maurice Symonette, Mack Wells. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(AM)
May 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutshe Bank National Trust Company, GMAC, HSBC Bank USA, National Association, Home Equity Loan Trust, Home Equityloan, Homecomings Financial LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Lancaster Mortgage Bankers, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association Filing fee $405, receipt number TPA 70487 filed by Mack Wells, Maurice Symonette. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Exhibit Part 3, #4 Exhibit Part 4, #5 Exhibit Part 5, #6 Exhibit Part 6)(AM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Symonette et al v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Symonette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mack Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutshe Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Equityloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Equity Loan Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lancaster Mortgage Bankers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homecomings Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?