DARDEN v. ASTRUE
Plaintiff: CHERYL DARDEN
Defendant: MICHAEL J ASTRUE
Case Number: 1:2009cv00120
Filed: May 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: ALLAN KORNBLUM
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 3/10/2010. (jws)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re 1 Complaint and 10 Answer to Complaint, 11 SS Transcript/Admin Record: Pltf shall have until 10/5/2009 to file a memorandum in support of complaint. Deft shall have 30 days from receipt of Pltf's memorandum to file a response. ( Memorandum in Support due by 10/5/2009., Memorandum in Opposition due by 11/5/2009.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 8/4/2009. (jws)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 4 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHERYL DARDEN and directing clerk to issue summons. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 5/22/09. (bkp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DARDEN v. ASTRUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL DARDEN
Represented By: N ALBERT BACHARACH, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J ASTRUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?