July 1, 2014 |
Filing
241
ORDER GRANTING H-2A FARMWORKER PLAINTIFFS' 134 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of the H-2A Farmwork Plaintiffs against Defendants, STEVEN M DAVIS and STEVEN DAVIS FARMS LLC, jointly a nd severally, for transportation and and visa reimbursements for each H-2A Plaintiff in the amount of $21,294.49, and judgment in the amount of $39,131.88, for wage damages for Group II and Group III Plaintiffs, for total judgment in the amount of $60,426.37. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/1/2014. (jws)
|
October 29, 2012 |
Filing
198
ORDER re 171 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney is GRANTED. 181 MOTION for Leave to File Reply is DENIED as moot. Defendants file (1) notice of appearance by new lawyer, or request more time to find new lawyer, or written notice by STEVEN DAVIS to proceed pro se. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/30/2012).). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 10/29/2012. (jws)(Copy of order to Defs as directed.)
|
July 30, 2012 |
Filing
170
ORDER denying 136 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 7/30/2012. (jws)
|
May 30, 2012 |
Filing
154
ORDER: Claims brought by RODELIN DEMPAIRE are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE due to his abandonment of the case and failure to prosecute. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 5/30/2012. (jws)
|
May 10, 2012 |
Filing
140
ORDER re 133 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by RODELIN DEMPAIRE is GRANTED. Attorney Amanda Caldwell and Florida Rural Legal Services are relieved of further responsibility as counsel for Plaintiff in this case. C lerk shall send copy of this order to Plaintiff by certified mail, return receipt requested. Plaintiff shall respond to this order by (1) filing a notice of appearance by his new lawyer, (2) filing a request for more time to find a new lawyer along w ith an explanation of why additional time is needed, or (3) filing a written notice stating that he will proceed pro se in this case. (Response Deadline - by 5/23/2012.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 5/10/2012. (jws)(Plaintiff sent copy of order per directions.)
|
May 9, 2012 |
Filing
139
ORDER re 138 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses to Motions for Summary Judgment filed by STEVEN DAVIS FARMS LLC is GRANTED. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if responses not filed earlier: 5/25/2012).). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 5/25/2012. (jws)
|
April 30, 2012 |
Filing
137
ORDER re 132 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice filed by MAX ETIENNE, ROMELDINE PIEREE is GRANTED. Parties shall bear their own costs and fees. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 4/30/2012. (jws)
|
April 12, 2012 |
Filing
126
ORDER re 125 Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions is GRANTED. (Dispositive Motions to be filed by 4/23/2012.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 4/12/2012. (jws)
|
March 2, 2012 |
Filing
116
ORDER re 115 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery unopposedThird MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions unopposed filed by Plaintiffs is GRANTED. Discovery period extended to allow Plaintiffs to re-take deposition of Cabioch Bontemps. (Dispositive Motions to be filed by 4/13/2012., Discovery due by 3/12/2012.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 3/2/2012. (jws)
|
February 10, 2012 |
Filing
110
ORDER re 109 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive filed by Plaintiffs is GRANTED. Discovery is re-opened to allow Plaintiffs to re-take deposition of Cabioch Bontemps. (Dispositive Motions to be filed by 3/12/2012.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 2/10/2012. (jws)
|
May 23, 2011 |
Filing
65
ORDER GRANTING 60 MOTION Dismiss Claims Without Prejudice of Plaintiffs, Judes St. Hilaire, Jummy Moncoeur, Paulnise Dolce, Slandley Dolce, Logene Pierre, Therese Guerrier, Ducasse Waldex, and Marc Auguste UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Plaintiffs and TERMINATED from this action. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 5/23/2011. (jws)
|
March 16, 2011 |
Filing
48
ORDER GRANTING 45 Plaintiff's First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Set Aside Default. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/25/2011).). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/16/2011. (jws)
|
March 11, 2011 |
Filing
44
ORDER DENYING 36 First Motion to Compel Production of Documents; DENYING 38 Amended Motion for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with a Court Order filed by Plaintiffs. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/11/2011. (jws)
|
December 29, 2010 |
Filing
26
ORDER granting 24 Motion to Compel and awarding the sum of $350.00 as a sanction for Plaintiffs having to prepare and file a motion to compel. Defendant shall pay Plaintiffs counsel the sum of $350.00 no later than January 7, 2011.. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 12/29/10. (bkp)
|