LEE v. DOUGLAS et al
Plaintiff: EXEVIOUS SWAYNE LEE
Defendant: MICHAEL DOUGLAS, BROWN and ALACHUA COUNTY JAIL
Case Number: 1:2010cv00187
Filed: September 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Adopting 14 Report and Recommendation - Plaintiff's 1 Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 5/23/2011. (jws)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER as to EXEVIOUS SWAYNE LEE directing Plaintiff to file an executed Prisoner Consent Form re: 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and an Amended Complaint re: 1 Complaint - documents due by 11/16/2010; signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 10/26/10 (blank Complaint and Prisoner Consent Form forwarded to Plaintiff) (tss)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by EXEVIOUS SWAYNE LEE: Clerk directed to forward to Plaintiff an application for IFP. Plaintiff shall return either (1) Application for IFP, or () pay full filing fee, or (3) file a notice of voluntary dismissal. (Fee due by 10/15/2010.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 9/17/2010. (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEE v. DOUGLAS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EXEVIOUS SWAYNE LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL DOUGLAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALACHUA COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?