PEREZ v. SIMPSON , et al
Plaintiff: MELVIN PEREZ
Defendant: FREDDIE MOCK, MICHAEL G SIMPSON, FRAUN HAYLEY WINBURN, MARTHA D HUMPHRIES, GLORIA C WIMBERLEY, MARC W LAND and M SOLANO
Case Number: 1:2011cv00180
Filed: August 31, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Presiding Judge: STEPHAN P MICKLE
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; approving 83 Report and Recommendation. This case is referred back to the Magistrate for further proceedings. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 8/27/2013. (jem)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER adopting 44 Report and Recommendation; granting in part, dismissed in part 34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 7/5/2012. This case is remanded to Magistrate Judge Gary R. Jones for further proceedings, where the only remaining claims are the alleged retaliatory threats made in violation of the First amendment by Defendants Simpson and Winburn and the only relief available to Plaintiff is nominal damages. (kdm)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER adopting 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint; DENYING AS MOOT 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 1/5/2012. The claims against Defendants Hum phries, Mock, Wimberley, Land, and Solano are dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The due process and retaliatory disciplinary report claims against Sgt. Simpson, as well as the due process claims against Officer Winburn are dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. (kdm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PEREZ v. SIMPSON , et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREDDIE MOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL G SIMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRAUN HAYLEY WINBURN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTHA D HUMPHRIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLORIA C WIMBERLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARC W LAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M SOLANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELVIN PEREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?