UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WILLIAMS
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: JEFFREY D WILLIAMS
Case Number: 1:2011cv00234
Filed: November 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Presiding Judge: STEPHAN P MICKLE
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING 14 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Plaintiff. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 11/20/2012. (jws)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER EXTENDING TIME: 21 MOTION to Extend Time filed by JEFFREY D WILLIAMS is GRANTED. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/20/2012.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 8/8/2012. (jws)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: 11 Motion to Compel Defendant's Initial Disclosures is GRANTED. Defendant must provide Plaintiff with initial disclosures by 8/24/2012. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 8/7/2012. (jws)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Defendant must file any material in opposition to 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/6/2012)., Notify Chambers on 8/7/2012.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 7/19/2012. (jws)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re 12 MOTION to Extend Time for Mediation Conference and for Partial Relief from Mediation Order filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Mediation to take place by 8/6/2012.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 6/15/2012. (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: BRUCE T RUSSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY D WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?