DOE v. ONEBEACON AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE
Defendant: ONEBEACON AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2011cv00275
Filed: December 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER: As to Count I of the Complaint, Plaintiff's 77 motion for partial summary judgment and Defendant's 76 motion for summary judgment are both GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Concerning the breach of contract a lleged in Count II of the Complaint, Plaintiffs 77 motion for partial summary judgment is DENIED and Defendants 76 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiffs remaining abated claims in Counts II, III, and IV of the Complaint are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to enter final judgment in favor of OneBeacon, and to close the file. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 10/9/2014. (jws)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: Defendant's 28 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 37 Motion to Compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendant's 52 MOTION to Strike is DENIED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 11/21/2012. (jws)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re 53 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by JOHN DOE is GRANTED. (Dispositive Motions to be filed by 3/22/2013., Discovery due by 3/1/2013.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 11/5/2012. (jws)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re 41 MOTION To Reschedule Hearing per 40 Order is GRANTED. Hearing reset for 10/3/2012 02:00 PM in U.S. Courthouse Gainesville before MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 9/28/2012. (jws)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 38 MOTION Requesting Oral Argument. Hearing scheduled for 10/3/2012 10:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Gainesville before MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES. Court has reserved 1 1/2 hours for the hearing. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 9/24/2012. (jws)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 32 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to 29 Response in Opposition to 28 Motion for Protective Order filed by ONEBEACON AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY is GRANTED. (Replies due by 9/17/2012.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 9/10/2012. (jws)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss, or alternative, abate counts II, III, & IV of Plaintiff's 8 complaint. Claim II is ABATED insofar as it alleges bad faith on the part of OneBeacon,pending re solution of Claim I and the underlying breach of contract alleged in Claim II. Claims III and IV are ABATED pending resolution of Claim I and the underlying breach of contract alleged in Claim II. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/8/2012. (jws)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint filed by ONEBEACON AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY. (Answer due by 1/27/2012.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 1/13/2012. (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOE v. ONEBEACON AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE
Represented By: WILLIAM CHARLES HUGHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONEBEACON AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: B RICHARD YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?