CHAMBLIN v. SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Petitioner: ANDREW CHAMBLIN
Respondent: SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 1:2013cv00025
Filed: February 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re 12 First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: Clerk directed to mail copy to Respondent and Florida Attorney General via certified mail, return receipt requested. Deadline for Respondent to file a response remains unchanged. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/14/2013. (jws)(Copies provided as noted in order.)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re 10 (Constued as) MOTION to Amend filed by ANDREW CHAMBLIN is GRANTED. Clerk shall send Petitioner a blank 28 U.S.C.§2254 petition form for state prisoners. Petitioner must file his original First Amended Petition, which shall include all 4 grounds for relief, w/2 identical copies. Deadline for Respondent to submit a response to petition remains 5/21/2013. (Amended Pleadings due by 3/14/2013.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 2/22/2013. (jws)(Form to Petitioner as directed; Order mailed to Respondent & Fla Atty General.)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Clerk shall serve a copy of 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and 4 MOTION to Accept Supplemental Exhibits along w/this order on Respondent and State of Florida Attorney General via regular mail. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 5/21/2013)., Replies due by 6/20/2013, if any.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 2/20/2013. (jws)(Copies provided as noted in order.)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Clerk shall forward Petitioner an application for IFP. Petitioner shall either file an application for IFP or pay $5.00 filing fee. (Fee/Application due by 3/8/2013.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 2/6/2013. (jws)(Form sent as order directed.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHAMBLIN v. SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ANDREW CHAMBLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?