QUARTERMAN v. GATOR HOSPITALITY, LLC et al

Plaintiff: LANIE QUARTERMAN
Defendant: GATOR HOSPITALITY, LLC, CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC.,, CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL INC and GATOR HOSPITALITY LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00178
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by GATOR HOSPITALITY LLC. (SMITH, NICOLE)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/30/2018. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/13/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/13/2018. Discovery due by 2/22/2019. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 3/15/2019. (atm)
October 24, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL INC. (KELLY, MICHAEL)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT GATOR HOSPITALITYS UNOPPOSED #9 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/12/18. Answer or response due by 11/1/2018. (tss)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by GATOR HOSPITALITY LLC. (SMITH, NICOLE)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONALS UNOPPOSED #6 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/10/18. Answer due by 10/24/2018. (tss)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE ANN WASULA on behalf of CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL INC (WASULA, CHRISTINE)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL INC. (WASULA, CHRISTINE)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LANIE QUARTERMAN. GATOR HOSPITALITY LLC served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Returned Executed) (KERR, JESSICA)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LANIE QUARTERMAN. CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL INC served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Returned Executed) (KERR, JESSICA)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL INC, GATOR HOSPITALITY LLC. (kdm)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (KERR, JESSICA)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4287120.), filed by LANIE QUARTERMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (KERR, JESSICA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: QUARTERMAN v. GATOR HOSPITALITY, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANIE QUARTERMAN
Represented By: JESSICA LYNN KERR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GATOR HOSPITALITY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL INC
Represented By: EDWARD SAMUEL POLK
Represented By: CHRISTINE ANN WASULA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GATOR HOSPITALITY LLC
Represented By: EDWARD SAMUEL POLK
Represented By: NICOLE SIEB SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?