MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS SERIES, LLC et al v. FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: SERIES 16-05-456 and MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS SERIES, LLC
Defendant: FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2018cv00196
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
2 Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Reset Deadlines: FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY answer due 12/7/2018 or file responsive pleading due by 12/7/2018. (bkp)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING SECOND ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPNOD TO COMPLAINT re: #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, ( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 12/3/2018).) Defendant shall file its responsive pleading to the complaint on or before December 7, 2018. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/19/18. (bkp)
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (ABATE, MARIA)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 ENLARGEMENT OF TIMETO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. (Defendant's Answer due by 11/26/2018). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/19/2018. (kdm)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (ABATE, MARIA)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. (** See docket entry #6 to view PDF.**) (kdm)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons served on Florida Farm Bureau General Insurance Company on 10/04/2018, filed by MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS SERIES, LLC, SERIES 16-05-456. (RUIZ, JOHN)
September 28, 2018 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS no longer assigned to case. (kdm)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE re #1 Complaint. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/28/2018. The Clerk is directed to reassign this case to Judge Gary R. Jones. (kdm)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (bkp)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE SUMMONS FOR ISSUANCE - FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY by MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS SERIES, LLC, SERIES 16-05-456 (RUIZ, JOHN)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (RUIZ, JOHN)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (CLASS ACTION) against FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4297061.), filed by MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS SERIES, LLC, SERIES 16-05-456. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit D-1, #6 Exhibit D-2, #7 Exhibit D-3, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F) (RUIZ, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS SERIES, LLC et al v. FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MARIA ELENA ABATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERIES 16-05-456
Represented By: JOHN H RUIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS SERIES, LLC
Represented By: JOHN H RUIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?