DUGGER v. MACK et al
Plaintiff: EDWARD L DUGGER
Defendant: Joseph C Mack, Pawn Pro, LLC, DRUMMOND COMMUNITY BANK, CHRISTIAN MACK and PAWN PRO LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00234
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER entered pursuant to #11 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/10/19.Discovery due by 9/1/2019, Dispositive Motions to be filed by 9/22/2019, Mediation Report due by 10/13/2019, and Bench Trial set for 1/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Gainesville before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. (tss)
January 10, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #11 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (tss)
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (HAMILTON, CHRISTOPHER)
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint served on Joseph C. Mack, aka Christian Mack on January 7, 2019, filed by EDWARD L DUGGER. (CHILDERS, SELDON)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by EDWARD L DUGGER. (CHILDERS, SELDON)
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT by JOSEPH C MACK, PAWN PRO LLC. (HAMILTON, CHRISTOPHER)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by JOSEPH C MACK, PAWN PRO LLC. (HAMILTON, CHRISTOPHER)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JOSEPH C MACK, PAWN PRO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (HAMILTON, CHRISTOPHER)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service - Pawn Pro by EDWARD L DUGGER. (CHILDERS, SELDON)
December 18, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/2/2019). (tss)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by EDWARD L DUGGER. (CHILDERS, SELDON)
December 12, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #2 Initial Scheduling Order --Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/11/2018. (None filed to date as of DRUMMOND COMMUNITY BANK.) (kdm)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by PAWN PRO LLC identifying Corporate Parent PAWN PRO LLC for PAWN PRO LLC.. (HAMILTON, CHRISTOPHER)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/26/18. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/11/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/10/2019. Discovery due by 3/26/2019. Status Report due by 12/26/2018. (tss)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pawn Pro, LLC, Joseph C Mack ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4340770.), filed by Pawn Pro, LLC, Joseph C Mack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Trial Court Docket, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing Affidavit of Dugger, #4 Exhibit Motion to Appoint Special Process Server, #5 Exhibit Order Appointing Special Process Server, #6 Exhibit Designation of Email Addresses, #7 Exhibit Summons -Mack, #8 Exhibit Summons - Drummond Bank, #9 Exhibit Summons - Pawn Pro, #10 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet - State Court, #11 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (HAMILTON, CHRISTOPHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUGGER v. MACK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph C Mack
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER F HAMILTON
Represented By: RYAN CHRISTOPHER REINERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pawn Pro, LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER F HAMILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRUMMOND COMMUNITY BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTIAN MACK
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER F HAMILTON
Represented By: RYAN CHRISTOPHER REINERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAWN PRO LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER F HAMILTON
Represented By: RYAN CHRISTOPHER REINERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD L DUGGER
Represented By: SELDON JEFF CHILDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?