COMPTON v. GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Plaintiff: JASON COMPTON
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00033
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #16 MOTION TO VACATE DEADLINE. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/18/2019. (kdm)
April 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Vacate Deadline to File Motion for Class Certification (UNOPPOSED) by JASON COMPTON. (PITTMAN, ADAM)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADMITTING JARED LEVINE PRO HAC VICE, granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Appointed JARED ALEXANDER LEVINE for GENERAL MOTORS LLC). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/8/2019. (kdm)
April 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jared A. Levine.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4450100.) by GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (LEVINE, JARED)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADMITTING ADAM W. PITTMAN PRO HAC VICE, granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Appointed ADAM WADE PITTMAN for JASON COMPTON). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/3/2019. (kdm)
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Adam W. Pittman.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4446835.) by JASON COMPTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (PITTMAN, ADAM)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADMITTING SEAN F. ROMMEL PRO HAC VICE, granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Appointed SEAN F ROMMEL for JASON COMPTON). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/2/2019. (kdm)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADMITTING JAMES C. WYLY PRO HAC VICE, granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Appointed JAMES CLARK WYLY for JASON COMPTON). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/2/2019. (kdm)
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean F. Rommel.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4446246.) by JASON COMPTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Good Standing Certificates, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (ROMMEL, SEAN)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James C. Wyly.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4446243.) by JASON COMPTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Good Standing Certificates, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (WYLY, JAMES)
March 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED #6 MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. (Answer due by 4/22/2019). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/17/2019. (kdm)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend TimeAgreed Motion for Extension of Time by GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (BOYD, GINGER)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by GINGER BARRY BOYD on behalf of GENERAL MOTORS LLC (BOYD, GINGER)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JASON COMPTON. GENERAL MOTORS LLC served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (TAPLEY, FRANK)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (kdm)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (TAPLEY, FRANK)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4411675.), filed by JASON COMPTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Summons) (TAPLEY, FRANK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMPTON v. GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON COMPTON
Represented By: FRANK JEROME TAPLEY
Represented By: JAMES CLARK WYLY
Represented By: SEAN F ROMMEL
Represented By: ADAM WADE PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Represented By: JARED ALEXANDER LEVINE
Represented By: GINGER BARRY BOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?