EXACTECH US INC v. MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC et al
Plaintiff: EXACTECH U.S., INC. and EXACTECH US INC
Defendant: HUGH BRADLEY and MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00057
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 12 Interdistrict Transfer to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota, Minneapolis Division. (New USDC Minnesota case number: 0:19-cv-1115.) (kdm)
April 25, 2019 Filing 12 Interdistrict Transfer to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota, Minneapolis Division located at United States Courthouse, 300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202, Minneapolis, MN 55415. (kdm)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' #4 MOTION TO TRANSFER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/24/2019. The Clerk must take all steps necessary to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota. The Clerk must close the file. (kdm)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC. (STIBOLT, DORI)
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Minnesota or in the alternative, MOTION to Stay filed by EXACTECH US INC. (LONDOT, JOHN)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Minnesota or in the alternative, MOTION to Stay filed by EXACTECH US INC. (LONDOT, JOHN)
April 16, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #5 INITIAL Scheduling Order -- Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 4/15/2019. (None filed to date as to MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC.) (kdm)
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint by HUGH BRADLEY, MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC. (STIBOLT, DORI)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by EXACTECH US INC. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/1/2019. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 4/15/2019., Joint Status Report on Discovery due by 5/1/2019., Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/15/2019., Discovery due by 7/30/2019., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 8/20/2019. (kdm)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Minnesota or in the alternative, ( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/15/2019).), MOTION to Stay by HUGH BRADLEY, MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Hugh Bradley, #2 Affidavit Eric J. Nystrom) (STIBOLT, DORI)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit to Notice of Removal by HUGH BRADLEY, MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Civil Cover Sheet) (STIBOLT, DORI)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HUGH BRADLEY, MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC from Alachua Circuit Court, case number 2019CA000824. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4442796.), filed by HUGH BRADLEY, MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (STIBOLT, DORI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EXACTECH US INC v. MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EXACTECH U.S., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EXACTECH US INC
Represented By: LORENCE JON BIELBY
Represented By: JOHN K LONDOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUGH BRADLEY
Represented By: DORI K STIBOLT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC
Represented By: DORI K STIBOLT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?