MYERS ET AL v. UNDERGROUND PIPELINE REHABILITATION INC ET AL
Plaintiff: Quinshell Myers and Towanda Myers
Defendant: Underground Pipeline Rehabilitation, Inc., William J. Hardee, UNDERGROUND PIPELINE REHABILITATION INC and WILLIAM J HARDEE
Case Number: 1:2019cv00063
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
2 Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING DISCOVERY JULY 2019 by QUINSHELL MYERS, TOWANDA MYERS. (RUSH, MARIAN)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/26/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 1:19cv63-AW/GRJ.
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING DISCOVERY by QUINSHELL MYERS, TOWANDA MYERS. (RUSH, MARIAN)
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 26 Disclosures by UNDERGROUND PIPELINE REHABILITATION INC. (COLE, BLAKE)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 26 Disclosures by QUINSHELL MYERS, TOWANDA MYERS. (RUSH, MARIAN)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY by TOWANDA MYERS, QUINSHELL MYERS re #5 Notice (Other) PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANT WILLIAM HARDEES AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by TOWANDA MYERS, QUINSHELL MYERS. (RUSH, MARIAN)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO UNDERGROUND PIPELINES AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ANSWER to Complaint by QUINSHELL MYERS, TOWANDA MYERS. (RUSH, MARIAN)
May 13, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings CRD to prepare PTO by 9/9/2019. (tss)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (bkp)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/10/19. Discovery due by 10/9/2019. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 10/30/2019. Jury Trial set for 2/25/2020 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Gainesville before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Mediation to take place by 11/6/2019. Mediation Report due by 11/20/2019. (bkp)
May 10, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (bkp)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (RUSH, MARIAN)
May 9, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #2 Initial Scheduling Order -- Status Report due by 5/8/2019. (None filed to date.) (kdm)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing State Court Documents by UNDERGROUND PIPELINE REHABILITATION INC (COLE, BLAKE) Modified on 5/8/2019 to add text(kdm).
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Attorney FRANK H COLE, III terminated. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/16/2019. Defendants shall continue to be represented by Blake H. Cole. (kdm)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by UNDERGROUND PIPELINE REHABILITATION INC. (COLE, BLAKE)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/9/19. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 4/23/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/23/2019. Discovery due by 8/8/2019. Status Report due by 5/8/2019. (bkp)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Underground Pipeline Rehabilitation, Inc. from Eighth Judicial Circuit, Alachua County, Florida, case number 2019-CA-000016. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4451034.), filed by Underground Pipeline Rehabilitation, Inc.. (COLE, FRANK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MYERS ET AL v. UNDERGROUND PIPELINE REHABILITATION INC ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Underground Pipeline Rehabilitation, Inc.
Represented By: FRANK H COLE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Hardee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNDERGROUND PIPELINE REHABILITATION INC
Represented By: BLAKE HOLMAN COLE
Represented By: FRANK H COLE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM J HARDEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinshell Myers
Represented By: MARIAN B RUSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Towanda Myers
Represented By: MARIAN B RUSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?