BROADCAST MUSIC, INC. et al v. HICKEY AND PUSATERI ENTERPRISES LLC et al

Plaintiff: BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, CONTESSA PUBLISHING LLC, DEVO, INC., EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC., SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC and BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION
Defendant: JEFFREY E HICKEY, HICKEY AND PUSATERI ENTERPRISES LLC and RICHARD T PUSATERI
Case Number: 1:2019cv00089
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
2 Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/26/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 1:19cv89-AW/GRJ.
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS by BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC, BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., CONTESSA PUBLISHING LLC, DEVO, INC., EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC., SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., SONY/ATV SONGS LLC (MESSA, ZACHARY)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC, BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., CONTESSA PUBLISHING LLC, DEVO, INC., EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC., SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., SONY/ATV SONGS LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bertelsmann, Inc. for BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC; Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC.; Corporate Parent SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT INC for SONY/ATV SONGS LLC; Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC.; Corporate Parent Capitol EMI Music Inc. for BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION; Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for BROADCAST MUSIC, INC... (MESSA, ZACHARY)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, CONTESSA PUBLISHING LLC, BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC., BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., DEVO, INC., BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC. RICHARD T PUSATERI served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. (MESSA, ZACHARY)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, CONTESSA PUBLISHING LLC, BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC., BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., DEVO, INC., BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC. JEFFREY E HICKEY served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (MESSA, ZACHARY)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, CONTESSA PUBLISHING LLC, BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC., BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., DEVO, INC., BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC. HICKEY AND PUSATERI ENTERPRISES LLC served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. (MESSA, ZACHARY)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 Copyright New Case Notification. Copy sent to the Register of Copyrights. (atm)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons) (atm)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (atm)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JEFFREY E HICKEY, HICKEY AND PUSATERI ENTERPRISES LLC, RICHARD T PUSATERI ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4491097.), filed by SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, CONTESSA PUBLISHING LLC, BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC., BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., DEVO, INC., BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Song Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons The Bank Bar, #4 Proposed Summons Jeff Hickey, #5 Proposed Summons Richard Pusateri) (MESSA, ZACHARY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROADCAST MUSIC, INC. et al v. HICKEY AND PUSATERI ENTERPRISES LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROADCAST MUSIC, INC.
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONY/ATV SONGS LLC
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONTESSA PUBLISHING LLC
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVO, INC.
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC.
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC.
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY E HICKEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HICKEY AND PUSATERI ENTERPRISES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD T PUSATERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?