GRIFFIN v. STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: CHRISTINE GRIFFIN
Defendant: STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00090
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
2 Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #14 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (kdm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (FURMAN, WENDY)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 EXTENSION OF TIMETO FILE JOINT REPORT. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/8/2019). Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 7/2/2019. (kdm)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Extend Time to File Objections to the Court's Pretrial Schedule by STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (FURMAN, WENDY)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/26/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 1:19cv90-AW/GRJ.
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery by STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (FURMAN, WENDY)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MEDIATION re Scheduling by STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY (FURMAN, WENDY)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent StanCorp Financial Group, Inc. for STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY.. (FURMAN, WENDY)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's Answer and Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (FURMAN, WENDY)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 26 Disclosures by CHRISTINE GRIFFIN. (KANN, TERENCE)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 First Request to Produce by CHRISTINE GRIFFIN. (KANN, TERENCE)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Service of First Interrogatories 1-18 by CHRISTINE GRIFFIN (KANN, TERENCE)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/16/19. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/30/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/1/2019. Discovery due by 9/13/2019. (tss)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (tss)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY from Alachua County Court, case number 2019-CA-1268. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4492232.), filed by STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents) (FURMAN, WENDY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRIFFIN v. STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE GRIFFIN
Represented By: TERENCE J KANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: WENDY LYNN FURMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?