TIAA FSB v. RENTZ et al
Plaintiff: TIAA FSB
Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE, ANGIE RENTZ and FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00167
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by TIAA FSB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bankrutpcy Notice) (GOLLAHON, SPENCER)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by SPENCER GOLLAHON on behalf of TIAA FSB (GOLLAHON, SPENCER)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #6 Amended Notice of Removal filed by ANGIE RENTZ - It is recommended this case should be REMANDED to the Circuit Court for the Eighth Judicial Circuit in and for Alachua County, Florida, and that the CLERK should be directed to send a certified copy of the order of remand to the Clerk of Court for the Eighth Judicial Circuit in and for Alachua County, Florida. Defendant's Request for Taking Judicial Notice, ECF No. #7 , should be DENIED AS MOOT. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 10/10/2019. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 11/7/2019. (atm)
October 8, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #7 NOTICE/Request For Taking Judicial Notice. (kdm)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE/Request For Taking Judicial Notice by ANGIE RENTZ. (kdm)
October 4, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #6 Amended Notice of Removal. (atm)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ANGIE RENTZ from CIRCUIT COURT EIGHTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT IN AND FOR ALACHUA COUNTY FLORIDA, case number 01-2018-CA-003458, filed by ANGIE RENTZ. (Attachments: #1 state record 1, #2 st record 2, #3 st record 3, #4 st record 4, #5 st record 5, #6 st record 6) (atm)
September 24, 2019 Set Deadlines - Show Cause Response due by 10/4/2019 re #5 ORDER. (atm)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Defendant must show cause on or before October 4, 2019, as to why this case should not be remanded to state court. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 9/24/2019. (atm)
September 9, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to GARY R JONES. (atm)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANGIE RENTZ. (atm)
August 23, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal, (No service copies received, no motion for IFP received, no fee paid). (kdm)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se. mailed to: ANGIE RENTZ, 1813 NE 8TH AVE, GAINESVILLE, FL 32641. (kdm)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm)
August 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ANGIE RENTZ from CIRCUIT COURT OF THE EIGHTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT IN AND FOR ALACHUA COUNTY FLORIDA, case number 012018CA3458., filed by ANGIE RENTZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (kdm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TIAA FSB v. RENTZ et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGIE RENTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIAA FSB
Represented By: SPENCER GOLLAHON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?