REDMON v. FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD
Plaintiff: ROBERT REDMON
Defendant: FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD
Case Number: 1:2019cv00181
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - It is recommended that this case be DISMISSED for failure to comply with an order of the court and failure to prosecute. R&R flag set signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 11/13/19. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 12/11/2019. (bkp)
November 12, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #3 Order - FIRST Amended Pleadings and Motion for IFP or Fee due by 11/8/2019. (**None filed to date.**) (kdm)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Complaint. (FIRST Amended Pleadings due by 11/8/2019., Motion for IFP or Fee due by 11/8/2019). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 10/21/2019. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank non-prisoner complaint form and motion to proceed in forma pauperis. (kdm) (Mailed as directed above.)
September 20, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, (No service copies received, no fee paid, no motion for IFP received). (kdm)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se. Mailed to: ROBERT REDMON, 6462 HAROLD AVE, COCOA, FL 32922. (kdm)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD, filed by ROBERT REDMON. (No service copies received, no fee paid, no motion for IFP received.) (kdm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REDMON v. FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT REDMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?