CREST EXTERIORS LLC v. NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: CREST EXTERIORS LLC
Petitioner: Crest Exteriors, LLC et al
Respondent: NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00262
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement. *** Please DO NOT file any subsequent pleadings in this case as it is closed and transferred to the the Tallahassee Division. The new TL case number is 4:19-cv-557-MW-CAS. Please file ALL future pleadings into the new case.*** (kdm)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA identifying Corporate Parent NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent Allied Group, Inc. for NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA.. (KELLER, THOMAS)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 Intradistrict Transfer to Tallahassee Division, Clerk's Office, 111 N Adams St, Suite 322, Tallahassee, FL 32301. Case# assigned 4:19-cv-00557-MW-CAS. (kdm) Modified on 11/20/2019 to correct text (kdm).
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 11/13/2019. The Clerk of Court must TRANSFER this case to the Tallahassee Division of this Court for all further proceedings and close the file. (kdm)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT as to CREST EXTERIORS LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (***Mailed to Attorney: Darion Montes de Oca, Esq., HL Law Group PA, 2601 E Oakland Park Blvd, Suite 503, Fort Lauderdale, FL 33306-1617. Phone: 954-713-1212. ***) (kdm)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to CREST EXTERIORS LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (***Mailed to Attorney: Darion Montes de Oca, Esq., HL Law Group PA, 2601 E Oakland Park Blvd, Suite 503, Fort Lauderdale, FL 33306-1617. Phone: 954-713-1212. ***) (kdm)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA from 2nd Judicial Circuit, Leon County, case number 2019-CA-001650. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4697482.), filed by NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Plt's Verified Responses to Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit B - Precision Construction Estimate, #4 Exhibit C- State Court Pleadings) (KELLER, THOMAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CREST EXTERIORS LLC v. NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: THOMAS A KELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Crest Exteriors, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CREST EXTERIORS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?