GILLIGAN GOODING FRANJOLA & BATSEL PA v. BENDER
Appellant: GILLIGAN GOODING FRANJOLA & BATSEL PA
Appellee: THERESA M BENDER
Case Number: 1:2019cv00300
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution filed by GILLIGAN GOODING FRANJOLA & BATSEL PA. (FRANJOLA, GEORGE)
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution by THERESA M BENDER. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/17/2020). (FORSTHOEFEL, KEVIN)
November 27, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #1 BANKRUPTCY APPEAL (bkp)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL SHEET by GILLIGAN GOODING FRANJOLA & BATSEL PA (Attachments: #1 Prioria, Certified Docket Sheet, #2 Prioria, Order Granting Motion for Turnover, bkr 388, #3 Prioria, Notice of Appeal, bkr 403, #4 Prioria, Motion for Leave to Appeal, bkr 405) (Hawkins, Jestin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GILLIGAN GOODING FRANJOLA & BATSEL PA v. BENDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: GILLIGAN GOODING FRANJOLA & BATSEL PA
Represented By: GEORGE FRANJOLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THERESA M BENDER
Represented By: KEVIN ANDREW FORSTHOEFEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?