UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $233,900.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $233,900.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Claimant: MARLO M SCOTT
Case Number: 1:2019cv00316
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 Claimant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by MARLO M SCOTT. (RUSH, ROBERT)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING CLAIM by MARLO M SCOTT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Claim Form) (RUSH, ROBERT)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE on behalf of Claimant, Marlo M. Scott as to $233,900.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY re: #3 and #5 Notice of Appearance (RUSH, ROBERT) Modified on 1/6/2020 (tss).
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE on behalf of Claimant, Marlo M. Scott as to $233,900.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY re: #3 Notice of Appearance (RUSH, ROBERT) Modified on 1/6/2020 (tss).
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS by $233,900.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY (RUSH, ROBERT)
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT ANTHONY RUSH on behalf of $233,900.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY (RUSH, ROBERT)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (DREY, KATHYRN)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM) against $233,900.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Verified Complaint) (DREY, KATHYRN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $233,900.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $233,900.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: KATHYRN WILBURN DREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: MARLO M SCOTT
Represented By: ROBERT ANTHONY RUSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?