MELON ACRES INC v. NAVARRETE et al
Plaintiff: Melon Acres, Inc. and MELON ACRES INC
Defendant: Jaime Navarrete and Alma Villa
Case Number: 1:2020cv00049
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RECOGNIZING BANKRUPTYCY STAY AND REQUIRING STATUS REPORTS re #9 Suggestion of Bankruptcy filed by MELON ACRES INC ( Status Report due by 8/30/2020) signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 4/14/20. (bkp)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Defendants Alma Villa and Jaime Navarrete by MELON ACRES INC. (STOKES, CRAIG)
April 1, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Jaime Navarette and Alma Villa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Clerk's Entry of Default) (STOKES, CRAIG)
April 1, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #6 Summons Returned Executed, #7 Summons Returned Executed - answer due 3/19/20 - nothing filed to date (tss)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MELON ACRES INC. ALMA VILLA served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (STOKES, CRAIG)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MELON ACRES INC. JAIME NAVARRETE served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (STOKES, CRAIG)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ALMA VILLA. (tss)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JAIME NAVARRETE. (tss)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (tss)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by Melon Acres, Inc.. (STOKES, CRAIG)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alma Villa, Jaime Navarrete ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4897516.), filed by Melon Acres, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - A&J Produce Online PACA Record, #2 Exhibit B - Open Invoices, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons to Jaime Navarrete, #5 Summons to Alma Villa) (STOKES, CRAIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MELON ACRES INC v. NAVARRETE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Navarrete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alma Villa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melon Acres, Inc.
Represented By: CRAIG ALAN STOKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELON ACRES INC
Represented By: CRAIG ALAN STOKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?