WILLIAMS et al v. DESANTIS et al
Plaintiff: Williams, KATHLEEN WINTERS, TERRIAYNA SPILLMAN, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, ACACIA WILLIAMS, RAY WINTERS, DREAM DEFENDERS, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, SHEILA YOUNG, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, ZEBRA COALITION and MURRAY HELLER
Defendant: DESANTIS, FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION, LAUREL M LEE, RON DESANTIS, DEBORAH K OSBORNE, CANVASSING BOARD OF BAY COUNTY, CHRISTINA WHITE, CANVASSING BOARD OF FLAGLER COUNTY, DAVID H STAFFORD, CANVASSING BOARD OF GULF COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF WALTON COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF ORANGE COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF MONROE COUNTY, JENNIFER J EDWARDS, GLENDA B WILLIAMS, BRENDA HOOTS, CANVASSING BOARD OF HARDEE COUNTY, HEATHER RILEY, TOMMY DOYLE, CANVASSING BOARD OF LAKE COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF SUWANNEE COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF PASCO COUNTY, VICKY OAKES, WILLIAM KEEN, KIM A BARTON, CANVASSING BOARD OF OKEECHOBEE COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF HAMILTON COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF JEFFERSON COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF SANTA ROSA COUNTY, BILL COWLES, BRIAN E CORLEY, CANVASSING BOARD OF HIGHLANDS COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF INDIAN RIVER COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF LIBERTY COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF MIAMI-DADE COUNTY, DANA SOUTHERLAND, DEBORAH CLARK, SHIRLEY G KNIGHT, DIANE SMITH, WESLEY WILCOX, DIANE HAGAN, RON TURNER, MIKE HOGAN, PENNY OGG, SUSAN A GILL, CANVASSING BOARD OF LEE COUNTY, LAURA HUTTO, CANVASSING BOARD OF MARION COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF CHARLOTTE COUNTY, PETER ANTONACCI, MARK F NEGLEY, LORI SCOTT, CANVASSING BOARD OF GILCHRIST COUNTY, LESLIE ROSSWAY SWAN, TERRY L VAUGHAN, SYLVIA D STEPHENS, CANVASSING BOARD OF CALHOUN COUNTY, MICHAEL BENNETT, CANVASSING BOARD OF PALM BEACH COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF CITRUS COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF OSCEOLA COUNTY, TAMMY JONES, CANVASSING BOARD OF BROWARD COUNTY, LORI EDWARDS, HENRY WELLS, KAITI LENHART, JOYCE GRIFFIN, CAROL F RUDD, CANVASSING BOARD OF SEMINOLE COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF COLUMBIA COUNTY, LISA LEWIS, CANVASSING BOARD OF MANATEE COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF PINELLAS COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF CLAY COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF UNION COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF LAFAYETTE COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF MADISON COUNTY, SHARON CHASON, CANVASSING BOARD OF DIXIE COUNTY, CHRIS H CHAMBLESS, MARY JANE ARRINGTON, VICKI P CANNON, CONNIE SANCHEZ, ELIZABETH P HORNE, THOMAS R HARDEE, ALAN HAYS, CANVASSING BOARD OF FRANKLIN COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF PUTNAM COUNTY, GINA MCDOWELL, WENDY SARTORY LINK, CANVASSING BOARD OF ST JOHNS COUNTY, CRAIG LATIMER, CANVASSING BOARD OF ST LUCIE COUNTY, MARK ANDERSEN, CANVASSING BOARD OF WAKULLA COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF NASSAU COUNTY, ALETRIS FARNAM, CANVASSING BOARD OF POLK COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF GADSDEN COUNTY, JOHN HANLON, MARTY BISHOP, STARLET CANNON, CANVASSING BOARD OF LEVY COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF OKALOOSA COUNTY, NITA CRAWFORD, CANVASSING BOARD OF BRADFORD COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF GLADES COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF ESCAMBIA COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF HENDRY COUNTY, TAPPIE A VILLANE, VICKI DAVIS, CANVASSING BOARD OF LEON COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF SUMTER COUNTY, MARK EARLEY, PAUL A STAMOULIS, CANVASSING BOARD OF HOLMES COUNTY, CHRIS ANDERSON, CANVASSING BOARD OF MARTIN COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY, SHIRLEY ANDERSON, CANVASSING BOARD OF VOLUSIA COUNTY, GERTRUDE WALKER, CANVASSING BOARD OF DUVAL COUNTY, PAUL A LUX, CANVASSING BOARD OF SARASOTA COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF HERNANDO COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF BAKER COUNTY, BOBBY BEASLEY, CANVASSING BOARD OF ALACHUA COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF BREVARD COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF COLLIER COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF WASHINGTON COUNTY, THERISA MEADOWS, TRAVIS HART, CANVASSING BOARD OF TAYLOR COUNTY, CANVASSING BOARD OF JACKSON COUNTY, CHARLES OVERTURF and CANVASSING BOARD OF DESOTO COUNTY
Case Number: 1:2020cv00067
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Referring Judge: GARY R JONES
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Summonses to be Issued by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, ACACIA WILLIAMS, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION re #47 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons to Alachua County SOE, #2 Exhibit Summons to Baker County SOE, #3 Exhibit Summons to Bay County SOE, #4 Exhibit Summons to Bradford County SOE, #5 Exhibit Summons to Brevard County SOE, #6 Exhibit Summons to Broward County SOE, #7 Exhibit Summons to Calhoun County SOE, #8 Exhibit Summons to Charlotte County SOE, #9 Exhibit Summons to Citrus County SOE, #10 Exhibit Summons to Clay County SOE, #11 Exhibit Summons to Collier County SOE, #12 Exhibit Summons to Columbia County SOE, #13 Exhibit Summons to DeSoto County SOE, #14 Exhibit Summons to Dixie County SOE, #15 Exhibit Summons to Duval County SOE, #16 Exhibit Summons to Escambia County SOE, #17 Exhibit Summons to Flager County SOE, #18 Exhibit Summons to Franklin County SOE, #19 Exhibit Summons to Gadsden County SOE, #20 Exhibit Summons to Gilchrist County SOE, #21 Exhibit Summons to Glades County SOE, #22 Exhibit Summons to Gulf County SOE, #23 Exhibit Summons to Hamilton County SOE, #24 Exhibit Summons to Hardee County SOE, #25 Exhibit Summons to Hendry County SOE, #26 Exhibit Summons to Hernando County SOE, #27 Exhibit Summons to Highlands County SOE, #28 Exhibit Summons to Hillsborough County SOE, #29 Exhibit Summons to Holmes County SOE, #30 Exhibit Summons to Indian River County SOE, #31 Exhibit Summons to Jackson County SOE, #32 Exhibit Summons to Jefferson County SOE, #33 Exhibit Summons to Lafayette County SOE, #34 Exhibit Summons to Lake County SOE, #35 Exhibit Summons to Lee County SOE, #36 Exhibit Summons to Leon County SOE, #37 Exhibit Summons to Levy County SOE, #38 Exhibit Summons to Liberty County SOE, #39 Exhibit Summons to Madison County SOE, #40 Exhibit Summons to Manatee County SOE, #41 Exhibit Summons to Marion County SOE, #42 Exhibit Summons to Martin County SOE, #43 Exhibit Summons to Miami-Dade County SOE, #44 Exhibit Summons to Monroe County SOE, #45 Exhibit Summons to Nassau County SOE, #46 Exhibit Summons to Okaloosa County SOE, #47 Exhibit Summons to Okeechobee County SOE, #48 Exhibit Summons to Orange County SOE, #49 Exhibit Summons to Osceola County SOE, #50 Exhibit Summons to Palm Beach County SOE, #51 Exhibit Summons to Pascoe County SOE, #52 Exhibit Summons to Pinellas County SOE, #53 Exhibit Summons to Polk County SOE, #54 Exhibit Summons to Putnam County SOE, #55 Exhibit Summons to Santa Rosa County SOE, #56 Exhibit Summons to Sarasota County SOE, #57 Exhibit Summons to Seminole County SOE, #58 Exhibit Summons to St. Johns County SOE, #59 Exhibit Summons to St. Lucie County SOE, #60 Exhibit Summons to Sumter County SOE, #61 Exhibit Summons to Suwannee County SOE, #62 Exhibit Summons to Taylor County SOE, #63 Exhibit Summons to Union County SOE, #64 Exhibit Summons to Volusia County SOE, #65 Exhibit Summons to Wakulla County SOE, #66 Exhibit Summons to Walton County SOE, #67 Exhibit Summons to Washington County SOE, #68 Exhibit Summons to Alachua County Canvassing Board, #69 Exhibit Summons to Baker County Canvassing Board, #70 Exhibit Summons to Bay County Canvassing Board, #71 Exhibit Summons to Bradford County Canvassing Board, #72 Exhibit Summons to Brevard County Canvassing Board, #73 Exhibit Summons to Broward County Canvassing Board, #74 Exhibit Summons to Calhoun County Canvassing Board, #75 Exhibit Summons to Charlotte County Canvassing Board, #76 Exhibit Summons to Citrus County Canvassing Board, #77 Exhibit Summons to Clay County Canvassing Board, #78 Exhibit Summons to Collier County Canvassing Board, #79 Exhibit Summons to Columbia County Canvassing Board, #80 Exhibit Summons to DeSoto County Canvassing Board, #81 Exhibit Summons to Dixie County Canvassing Board, #82 Exhibit Summons to Duval County Canvassing Board, #83 Exhibit Summons to Escambia County Canvassing Board, #84 Exhibit Summons to Flager County Canvassing Board, #85 Exhibit Summons to Franklin County Canvassing Board, #86 Exhibit Summons to Gadsden County Canvassing Board, #87 Exhibit Summons to Gilchrist County Canvassing Board, #88 Exhibit Summons to Glades County Canvassing Board, #89 Exhibit Summons to Gulf County Canvassing Board, #90 Exhibit Summons to Hamilton County Canvassing Board, #91 Exhibit Summons to Hardee County Canvassing Board, #92 Exhibit Summons to Hendry County Canvassing Board, #93 Exhibit Summons to Hernando County Canvassing Board, #94 Exhibit Summons to Highlands County Canvassing Board, #95 Exhibit Summons to Hillsborough County Canvassing Board, #96 Exhibit Summons to Holmes County Canvassing Board, #97 Exhibit Summons to Indian River County Canvassing Board, #98 Exhibit Summons to Jackson County Canvassing Board, #99 Exhibit Summons to Jefferson County Canvassing Board, #100 Exhibit Summons to Lafayette County Canvassing Board, #101 Exhibit Summons to Lake County Canvassing Board, #102 Exhibit Summons to Lee County Canvassing Board, #103 Exhibit Summons to Leon County Canvassing Board, #104 Exhibit Summons to Liberty County Canvassing Board, #105 Exhibit Summons to Madison County Canvassing Board, #106 Exhibit Summons to Manatee County Canvassing Board, #107 Exhibit Summons to Marion County Canvassing Board, #108 Exhibit Summons to Martin County Canvassing Board, #109 Exhibit Summons to Miami-Dade County Canvassing Board, #110 Exhibit Summons to Monroe County Canvassing Board, #111 Exhibit Summons to Nassau County Canvassing Board, #112 Exhibit Summons to Okaloosa County Canvassing Board, #113 Exhibit Summons to Okeechobee County Canvassing Board, #114 Exhibit Summons to Orange County Canvassing Board, #115 Exhibit Summons to Osceola County Canvassing Board, #116 Exhibit Summons to Palm Beach County Canvassing Board, #117 Exhibit Summons to Pascoe County Canvassing Board, #118 Exhibit Summons to Pinellas County Canvassing Board, #119 Exhibit Summons to Polk County Canvassing Board, #120 Exhibit Summons to Putnam County Canvassing Board, #121 Exhibit Summons to Santa Rosa County Canvassing Board, #122 Exhibit Summons to Sarasota County Canvassing Board, #123 Exhibit Summons to Seminole County Canvassing Board, #124 Exhibit Summons to St. Johns County Canvassing Board, #125 Exhibit Summons to St. Lucie County Canvassing Board, #126 Exhibit Summons to Sumter County Canvassing Board, #127 Exhibit Summons to Suwannee County Canvassing Board, #128 Exhibit Summons to Taylor County Canvassing Board, #129 Exhibit Summons to Union County Canvassing Board, #130 Exhibit Summons to Volusia County Canvassing Board, #131 Exhibit Summons to Wakulla County Canvassing Board, #132 Exhibit Summons to Walton County Canvassing Board, #133 Exhibit Summons to Washington County Canvassing Board) (NAIFEH, STUART)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Appointed SEAN EMERSON GORDON-MARVIN for BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, ACACIA WILLIAMS, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 5/13/2020. (atm)
May 13, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #51 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean Emerson Gordon-Marvin.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5207590.). Referred to GARY R JONES. (bkp)
May 12, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean Emerson Gordon-Marvin.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5207590.) by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, ACACIA WILLIAMS, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing Sean Emerson Gordon-Marvin) (GORDON-MARVIN, SEAN)
May 12, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2020 09:00 AM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Call in number: 888-684-8852Access code: 3243416#Security code: 1234# s/ Cindy MarkleyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting in part re #45 Emergency MOTION to Extend Time Modify Pretrial Schedule. The deadline is extended to May 26 for the plaintiffs' supplement to their preliminary-injunction motion, for summary-judgment motions, and for the plaintiffs' Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) disclosures. The plaintiffs must identify their experts and provide possible deposition dates by May 18. The other parts of the emergency motion will be addressed at the preliminary Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 pretrial conference that will be scheduled in this and a related case. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/12/2020. (atm)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. By a separate notice, the clerk must set a telephonic preliminary Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 pretrial conference simultaneously in these two cases (1:20cv67-RH-GRJ and 4:20cv236-RH-MJF) for May 22, 2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/12/2020. (atm)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. The plaintiffs' consented motion, ECF No. #44 , for leave to file the second amended complaint is granted. The second amended complaint, ECF No. [44-1], is deemed filed as of May 8, 2020. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 5/22/2020). Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/11/2020. (atm)
May 11, 2020 Filing 45 Emergency MOTION to Extend TimeModify Pretrial Schedule by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, ACACIA WILLIAMS, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION. (NAIFEH, STUART)
May 8, 2020 Filing 47 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DREAM DEFENDERS, SHEILA YOUNG, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, ACACIA WILLIAMS, BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, MURRAY HELLER, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, ZEBRA COALITION. (atm)
May 8, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to File second amended complaint by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, ACACIA WILLIAMS, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Appendix Proposed Order) (NAIFEH, STUART)
May 8, 2020 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, SHEILA YOUNG, BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, ACACIA WILLIAMS, ZEBRA COALITION. (NAIFEH, STUART)
May 4, 2020 Filing 42 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING: Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Gainesville before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. NOTE: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodation, such as a hearing impairment that requires a sign language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact Cindy Markley at 850-521-3518 in the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Cindy MarkleyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gilda Daniels for BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, TERRIAYNA SPILLMAN, ACACIA WILLIAMS, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 4/24/2020. (atm)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DISMISSING THE WINTERS CLAIMS. Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #38 filed by KATHLEEN WINTERS and #37 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by RAY WINTERS are dismissed without prejudice. I do not direct the entry of judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 4/24/2020. (atm)
April 24, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gilda Daniels.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5121254.). Referred to GARY R JONES. (bkp)
April 23, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gilda Daniels.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5121254.) by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, TERRIAYNA SPILLMAN, ACACIA WILLIAMS, KATHLEEN WINTERS, RAY WINTERS, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (SCOTT, SHARION)
April 21, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by KATHLEEN WINTERS (NAIFEH, STUART)
April 21, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by RAY WINTERS (NAIFEH, STUART)
April 20, 2020 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by Zebra Coalition. (NAIFEH, STUART)
April 20, 2020 Filing 35 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, DREAM DEFENDERS, BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, ACACIA WILLIAMS, Zebra Coalition, Murray Heller, Sheila Young, Celcio Eduardo Romero, Paulina Hernandez Morales. (NAIFEH, STUART)
April 20, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY LEEDS NEWHALL on behalf of FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION (NEWHALL, TIMOTHY)
April 20, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH ANN TEEGEN on behalf of FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION (TEEGEN, ELIZABETH)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Appointed EMILY MIRANDA GALINDO for BIANCA MARIA BAEZ,EMILY MIRANDA GALINDO for DREAM DEFENDERS,EMILY MIRANDA GALINDO for NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND,EMILY MIRANDA GALINDO for ORGANIZE FLORIDA,EMILY MIRANDA GALINDO for ACACIA WILLIAMS,EMILY MIRANDA GALINDO for KATHLEEN WINTERS,EMILY MIRANDA GALINDO for RAY WINTERS) signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 4/20/20. (bkp)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Appointed SHARION TRENELL SCOTT for BIANCA MARIA BAEZ,SHARION TRENELL SCOTT for DREAM DEFENDERS,SHARION TRENELL SCOTT for NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND,SHARION TRENELL SCOTT for ORGANIZE FLORIDA,SHARION TRENELL SCOTT for ACACIA WILLIAMS,SHARION TRENELL SCOTT for KATHLEEN WINTERS,SHARION TRENELL SCOTT for RAY WINTERS) signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 4/20/20. (bkp)
April 20, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Miranda Galindo.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5098528.), #29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sharion Scott.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5093927.). Referred to GARY R JONES. (bkp)
April 17, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Miranda Galindo.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5098528.) by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, ACACIA WILLIAMS, KATHLEEN WINTERS, RAY WINTERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Miranda Galindo) (GALINDO, EMILY)
April 16, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sharion Scott.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5093927.) by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, TERRIAYNA SPILLMAN, ACACIA WILLIAMS, KATHLEEN WINTERS, RAY WINTERS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (SCOTT, SHARION)
April 15, 2020 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RAY WINTERS, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, KATHLEEN WINTERS, DREAM DEFENDERS, BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, ACACIA WILLIAMS. RON DESANTIS waiver sent on 4/8/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (NAIFEH, STUART)
April 15, 2020 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RAY WINTERS, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, KATHLEEN WINTERS, DREAM DEFENDERS, BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, ACACIA WILLIAMS. FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION waiver sent on 4/8/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (NAIFEH, STUART)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #25 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting: (Discovery due by 6/5/2020. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 5/18/2020. Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Gainesville before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE.) Case referred to mediation. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 4/14/2020. (atm)
April 13, 2020 Filing 25 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (NAIFEH, STUART)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stuart Naifeh. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 4/7/20. (bkp)
April 6, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stuart Naifeh.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5039084.) by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, ACACIA WILLIAMS, KATHLEEN WINTERS, RAY WINTERS. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing Stuart Naifeh) (NAIFEH, STUART)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Appointed CHIRAAG BAINS for BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, ACACIA WILLIAMS, KATHLEEN WINTERS, RAY WINTERS). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 4/1/2020. (atm)
March 31, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chiraag Bains.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5021057.) by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, TERRIAYNA SPILLMAN, ACACIA WILLIAMS, KATHLEEN WINTERS, RAY WINTERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (ROMERO-CRAFT, KIRA)
March 19, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 7/28/2020 10:00 AM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Call in number: 888-684-8852Access code: 3243416#Security code: 1234# s/ Cindy MarkleyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Appointed KATHRYN C SADASIVAN for BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, TERRIAYNA SPILLMAN, ACACIA WILLIAMS, KATHLEEN WINTERS, RAY WINTERS). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/18/2020. (atm)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING THE RENEWED MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, DENYING IN PART THE MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND SETTING A SCHEDULE. The second motion for a temporary restraining order, ECF No. #16 , is denied. The motion for a preliminary injunction, ECF No. #4 , is denied with respect to the March 17 presidential primary and remains pending with respect to future elections. The deadline for the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) attorney conference is April 6, 2020. The deadline to file the Rule 26(f) report is 4/13/2020. The deadline for the defendants to respond to the remaining part of the preliminary-injunction motion, ECF No. #4 , is extended to 4/20/2020. Absent good cause set out in the 26(f) report, the discovery deadline will be 6/5/2020, and a consolidated hearing on the preliminary-injunction motion will occur during the two-week period that begins on July 20, 2020. Based on the plaintiff Terriayna Spillman's notice of voluntary dismissal, ECF No. #17 , the complaint is deemed amended to delete her claims. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 3/18/20. (blb)
March 17, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TERRIAYNA SPILLMAN (ROMERO-CRAFT, KIRA)
March 17, 2020 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, ACACIA WILLIAMS, KATHLEEN WINTERS, RAY WINTERS. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Declaration of Cierra Medina, #2 Appendix Declaration of Jessica Alcocer, #3 Appendix Declaration of Marina Golan-Vilella, #4 Appendix Declaration of Murray Heller, #5 Appendix Declaration of Rose Marie Barfield, #6 Appendix Declaration of Carolyn Thompson) (ROMERO-CRAFT, KIRA)
March 17, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kathryn C. Sadasivan.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4964747.) by NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, TERRIAYNA SPILLMAN, ACACIA WILLIAMS, KATHLEEN WINTERS, RAY WINTERS. (SADASIVAN, KATHRYN)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Appointed FRANCISCA D FAJANA for BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, TERRIAYNA SPILLMAN, ACACIA WILLIAMS, KATHLEEN WINTERS, RAY WINTERS). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/17/2020. (atm)
March 17, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fajana, Francisca.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4962550.) by ACACIA WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (FAJANA, FRANCISCA)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #4 a motion for a temporary restraining order. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 3/17/20. (sms)
March 17, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to RON DESANTIS, FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION, LAUREL M LEE. (kdm)
March 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE Corrected Summons of Ron DeSantis by Baez Maria Bianca, Dream Defenders, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, Organize Florida, Terriayna Spillman, Acacia Williams, Kathleen Winters, Ray Winters (ROMERO-CRAFT, KIRA)
March 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS ALLEN PRIMROSE on behalf of RON DESANTIS (PRIMROSE, NICHOLAS)
March 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE N MEROS, JR on behalf of LAUREL M LEE (MEROS, GEORGE)
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY on behalf of LAUREL M LEE (MCVAY, BRADLEY)
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by TARA R PRICE on behalf of LAUREL M LEE (PRICE, TARA)
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY E DAVIS on behalf of LAUREL M LEE (DAVIS, ASHLEY)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Baez Maria Bianca, Dream Defenders, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, Organize Florida, Terriayna Spillman, Acacia Williams, Kathleen Winters, Ray Winters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Acacia Williams, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Bianca M Baez, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Rachel Gilmer, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Eva Robinson, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Kathleen Winters, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Ray Winters, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Terriayna Spillman) (ROMERO-CRAFT, KIRA)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by Baez Maria Bianca, Dream Defenders, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, Organize Florida, Terriayna Spillman, Acacia Williams, Kathleen Winters, Ray Winters. (ROMERO-CRAFT, KIRA)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Attorney list) (ROMERO-CRAFT, KIRA)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4959842.), filed by Ray Winters, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, Kathleen Winters, Dream Defenders, Baez Maria Bianca, Organize Florida, Acacia Williams, Terriayna Spillman. (Attachments: #1 Summons for DeSantis, #2 Summons for Lee, #3 Summons for FL Elections Canvassing Board) (ROMERO-CRAFT, KIRA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS et al v. DESANTIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN WINTERS
Represented By: KIRA ROMERO-CRAFT
Represented By: EMILY MIRANDA GALINDO
Represented By: KATHRYN C SADASIVAN
Represented By: CHIRAAG BAINS
Represented By: SHARION TRENELL SCOTT
Represented By: FRANCISCA D FAJANA
Represented By: STUART C NAIFEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRIAYNA SPILLMAN
Represented By: KIRA ROMERO-CRAFT
Represented By: KATHRYN C SADASIVAN
Represented By: SHARION TRENELL SCOTT
Represented By: FRANCISCA D FAJANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND
Represented By: KIRA ROMERO-CRAFT
Represented By: EMILY MIRANDA GALINDO
Represented By: KATHRYN C SADASIVAN
Represented By: CHIRAAG BAINS
Represented By: SHARION TRENELL SCOTT
Represented By: SEAN EMERSON GORDON-MARVIN
Represented By: FRANCISCA D FAJANA
Represented By: STUART C NAIFEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIANCA MARIA BAEZ
Represented By: KIRA ROMERO-CRAFT
Represented By: EMILY MIRANDA GALINDO
Represented By: CHIRAAG BAINS
Represented By: SHARION TRENELL SCOTT
Represented By: SEAN EMERSON GORDON-MARVIN
Represented By: FRANCISCA D FAJANA
Represented By: KATHRYN C SADASIVAN
Represented By: STUART C NAIFEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACACIA WILLIAMS
Represented By: KIRA ROMERO-CRAFT
Represented By: EMILY MIRANDA GALINDO
Represented By: FRANCISCA D FAJANA
Represented By: KATHRYN C SADASIVAN
Represented By: CHIRAAG BAINS
Represented By: SHARION TRENELL SCOTT
Represented By: SEAN EMERSON GORDON-MARVIN
Represented By: STUART C NAIFEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAY WINTERS
Represented By: KIRA ROMERO-CRAFT
Represented By: EMILY MIRANDA GALINDO
Represented By: KATHRYN C SADASIVAN
Represented By: CHIRAAG BAINS
Represented By: SHARION TRENELL SCOTT
Represented By: FRANCISCA D FAJANA
Represented By: STUART C NAIFEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DREAM DEFENDERS
Represented By: KIRA ROMERO-CRAFT
Represented By: EMILY MIRANDA GALINDO
Represented By: CHIRAAG BAINS
Represented By: SHARION TRENELL SCOTT
Represented By: SEAN EMERSON GORDON-MARVIN
Represented By: FRANCISCA D FAJANA
Represented By: KATHRYN C SADASIVAN
Represented By: STUART C NAIFEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORGANIZE FLORIDA
Represented By: KIRA ROMERO-CRAFT
Represented By: EMILY MIRANDA GALINDO
Represented By: KATHRYN C SADASIVAN
Represented By: CHIRAAG BAINS
Represented By: SHARION TRENELL SCOTT
Represented By: SEAN EMERSON GORDON-MARVIN
Represented By: FRANCISCA D FAJANA
Represented By: STUART C NAIFEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES
Represented By: SHARION TRENELL SCOTT
Represented By: SEAN EMERSON GORDON-MARVIN
Represented By: STUART C NAIFEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEILA YOUNG
Represented By: SHARION TRENELL SCOTT
Represented By: SEAN EMERSON GORDON-MARVIN
Represented By: STUART C NAIFEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO
Represented By: SHARION TRENELL SCOTT
Represented By: SEAN EMERSON GORDON-MARVIN
Represented By: STUART C NAIFEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZEBRA COALITION
Represented By: SHARION TRENELL SCOTT
Represented By: SEAN EMERSON GORDON-MARVIN
Represented By: STUART C NAIFEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MURRAY HELLER
Represented By: SHARION TRENELL SCOTT
Represented By: SEAN EMERSON GORDON-MARVIN
Represented By: STUART C NAIFEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DESANTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION
Represented By: TIMOTHY LEEDS NEWHALL
Represented By: ELIZABETH ANN TEEGEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAUREL M LEE
Represented By: TARA R PRICE
Represented By: BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY
Represented By: ASHLEY E DAVIS
Represented By: GEORGE N MEROS, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RON DESANTIS
Represented By: NICHOLAS ALLEN PRIMROSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH K OSBORNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF BAY COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINA WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF FLAGLER COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID H STAFFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF GULF COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF WALTON COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF ORANGE COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF MONROE COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER J EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENDA B WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENDA HOOTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF HARDEE COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER RILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOMMY DOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF LAKE COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF SUWANNEE COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF PASCO COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICKY OAKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM KEEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIM A BARTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF OKEECHOBEE COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF HAMILTON COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF JEFFERSON COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF SANTA ROSA COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILL COWLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN E CORLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF HIGHLANDS COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF INDIAN RIVER COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF LIBERTY COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF MIAMI-DADE COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA SOUTHERLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHIRLEY G KNIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESLEY WILCOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE HAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RON TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE HOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNY OGG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN A GILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF LEE COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA HUTTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF MARION COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF CHARLOTTE COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER ANTONACCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK F NEGLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORI SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF GILCHRIST COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LESLIE ROSSWAY SWAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRY L VAUGHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYLVIA D STEPHENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF CALHOUN COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF PALM BEACH COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF CITRUS COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF OSCEOLA COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAMMY JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF BROWARD COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORI EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENRY WELLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAITI LENHART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOYCE GRIFFIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROL F RUDD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF SEMINOLE COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF COLUMBIA COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF MANATEE COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF PINELLAS COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF CLAY COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF UNION COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF LAFAYETTE COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF MADISON COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARON CHASON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF DIXIE COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS H CHAMBLESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY JANE ARRINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICKI P CANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONNIE SANCHEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH P HORNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS R HARDEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN HAYS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF FRANKLIN COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF PUTNAM COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GINA MCDOWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WENDY SARTORY LINK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF ST JOHNS COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG LATIMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF ST LUCIE COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK ANDERSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF WAKULLA COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF NASSAU COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALETRIS FARNAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF POLK COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF GADSDEN COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN HANLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTY BISHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STARLET CANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF LEVY COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF OKALOOSA COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NITA CRAWFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF BRADFORD COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF GLADES COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF ESCAMBIA COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF HENDRY COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAPPIE A VILLANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICKI DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF LEON COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF SUMTER COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK EARLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL A STAMOULIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF HOLMES COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF MARTIN COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHIRLEY ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF VOLUSIA COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERTRUDE WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF DUVAL COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL A LUX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF SARASOTA COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF HERNANDO COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF BAKER COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOBBY BEASLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF ALACHUA COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF BREVARD COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF COLLIER COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF WASHINGTON COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THERISA MEADOWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVIS HART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF TAYLOR COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF JACKSON COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES OVERTURF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANVASSING BOARD OF DESOTO COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?