JUUL LABS INC v. MODERN AGE TOBACCO
Plaintiff: JUUL LABS INC
Defendant: MODERN AGE TOBACCO
Case Number: 1:2020cv00154
Filed: July 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUUL LABS INC. MODERN AGE TOBACCO served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (HULL, BRYAN)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by JUUL LABS INC identifying Other Affiliate Altria Group Inc. for JUUL LABS INC.. (HULL, BRYAN)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 AO 120 Patent and Trademark New Case Notification. Copy sent electronically to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. ( *** Sent electronically. ***) (kdm)
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MODERN AGE TOBACCO. (kdm)
July 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (HULL, BRYAN)
July 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial against MODERN AGE TOBACCO ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5469287.), filed by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, #5 SUMMONS FOR MODERN AGE TOBACCO) (HULL, BRYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JUUL LABS INC v. MODERN AGE TOBACCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MODERN AGE TOBACCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUUL LABS INC
Represented By: BRYAN DAVID HULL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?