PERGROSSI v. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER JON PERGROSSI
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Case Number: 1:2020cv00196
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re #6 Order Accepting in Part Report and Recommendation (atm)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ACCEPTING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The clerk will enter judgment that says, "This case is DISMISSED without leave to amend pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)." The clerk will close the file. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 10/5/2020. (atm)
September 21, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - no objections filed (tss)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis in all listed cases. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 8/21/2020. (kdm) (*** Please see docket entry #4 to view PDF of order. ***) Modified on 8/25/2020 to add link (kdm).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OMNIBUS ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint (in all listed cases). (Show Cause Response due by 9/4/2020.) Recommended: that each of the captioned cases be dismissed without leave to amend as frivolous and/or for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). R&R flag set ( Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 9/18/2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 8/21/2020. (kdm)
August 19, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Referred to GARY R JONES. (atm)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (atm)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHRISTOPHER JON PERGROSSI. (atm)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, filed by CHRISTOPHER JON PERGROSSI. (no service copies) (atm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PERGROSSI v. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER JON PERGROSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?